This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/08/2023 at 06:20:44 (UTC).

Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. v. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2023 Merck Sharp Dohme B filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against v Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-2254

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendants

LUPIN LTD.

LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

LUPIN INC.

Plaintiff / Appellees

MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V.

MERCK SHARP & DOHME, LLC

Defendant / Appellants

AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.

AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.

USV PRIVATE LIMITED

GLAND PHARMA LIMITED

MANKIND PHARMA LTD.

LIFESTAR PHARMA LLC

FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC

DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.

DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.

SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.

SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED

SANDOZ INC.

LEK PHARMACEUTICALS, D.D.

MYLAN API US LLC

MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah M. Harris

Shayna S. Cook Esq.

Stanley E. Fisher

Sarah Geers

Andrea Weiss Jeffries

David M. Krinsky

Alan Ernst Littmann Esq.

Shaun Patrick Mahaffy

Doug J. Winnard

Anthony Insogna Esq.

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Timothy H. Kratz

George Barry III

Michael Patrick Hogan

R Touhey Myer

Robert Florence

Dmitry Shelhoff

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) MOTION of Appellants Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan Inc. to extend the time to 10/24/2023 to file brief. Service: 09/26/2023 by email. [952631] [23-2254] [Eric Werlinger] [Entered: 09/26/2023 05:46 PM]

#41

(#41) ORDER filed granting the motion [ # 39 ] to the extent that ECF No. 34-3 will be accepted for filing as Gland's confidential Certificate of Interest under Federal Circuit Rule 25.1(a)(2), and ECF No. 34-4 will be accepted for filing as Gland's non-confidential Certificate of Interest. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [951710] [LMS] [Entered: 09/22/2023 08:57 AM]

#40

(#40) Entry of Appearance for Sarah M. Harris; Doug J. Winnard; Shayna S. Cook; Alan E. Littman; Andrea W. Jeffries; Anthony M. Insogna; Sarah A. Geers as counsel for Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 09/12/2023 by email. [949336] [23-2254] [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 09/12/2023 10:25 AM]

39 #3

supporting document

39 #2

supporting document

39 #1

Motion to Seal Certificate of Interest

34 #3

Gland Non-Confidential Cert of Interest

34 #2

Attachment 1: Discovery Confidentiality Order

34 #1

Gland Cover Letter re Confidential Cert of Interest

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945362] [23-2254] [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 08/23/2023 03:41 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945360] [23-2254] [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 08/23/2023 03:38 PM]

#6

(#35) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/01/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [945902] [ALK] [Entered: 08/25/2023 11:05 AM]

#5

(#5) Entry of Appearance for Dmitry V. Shelhoff; Kenneth S. Canfield; Edward D. Pergament; Julia S. Kim as counsel for Appellants Mankind Pharma Ltd. and Lifestar Pharma LLC. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945248] [23-2254] [Dmitry Shelhoff] [Entered: 08/23/2023 12:23 PM]

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/28/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [944411] [JPS] [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:12 AM]

#3

(#4) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/28/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [944411] [JPS] [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:12 AM]

#2

(#2) Entry of Appearance for Charles B. Klein; Jovial Wong as counsel for Appellants Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. Service: 08/16/2023 by email. [943618] [23-2254] [Charles Klein] [Entered: 08/16/2023 03:03 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#43) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 42 ] filed by Appellants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Inc. and Mylan API US LLC. The opening brief is due 10/24/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [952825] [ALK] [Entered: 09/27/2023 12:39 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#42) MOTION of Appellants Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan Inc. to extend the time to 10/24/2023 to file brief. Service: 09/26/2023 by email. [952631] [23-2254] [Eric Werlinger] [Entered: 09/26/2023 05:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) ORDER filed granting the motion [ # 39 ] to the extent that ECF No. 34-3 will be accepted for filing as Gland's confidential Certificate of Interest under Federal Circuit Rule 25.1(a)(2), and ECF No. 34-4 will be accepted for filing as Gland's non-confidential Certificate of Interest. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [951710] [LMS] [Entered: 09/22/2023 08:57 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#40) Entry of Appearance for Sarah M. Harris; Doug J. Winnard; Shayna S. Cook; Alan E. Littman; Andrea W. Jeffries; Anthony M. Insogna; Sarah A. Geers as counsel for Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 09/12/2023 by email. [949336] [23-2254] [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 09/12/2023 10:25 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) MOTION of Appellant Gland Pharma Limited to seal document No. [ # 34 ]. Service: 09/07/2023 by email. [948400] [23-2254] [Matthew Wilkerson] [Entered: 09/07/2023 01:45 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) Corrected Entry of Appearance for Sarah M. Harris; Stanley E. Fisher; David M. Krinsky; Shaun P. Mahaffy as counsel for Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 09/01/2023 by email. [947345] [23-2254]--[Edited 09/01/2023 by ALK to correct docket text] [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 09/01/2023 12:56 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) Corrected Entry of Appearance for Robert L. Florence; Tasneem A. Dharamsi; Elizabeth M. Crompton as counsel for Appellant USV Private Limited. Service: 08/29/2023 by email. [946416] [23-2254] [Robert Florence] [Entered: 08/29/2023 09:48 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant USV Private Limited, Entry of Appearance [ # 9 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/01/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [945907] [ALK] [Entered: 08/25/2023 11:10 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/01/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [945902] [ALK] [Entered: 08/25/2023 11:05 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Gland Pharma Limited. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945484] [23-2254] [Matthew Wilkerson] [Entered: 08/23/2023 10:51 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Certificate of Interest for Appellant USV Private Limited. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945395] [23-2254] [Robert Florence] [Entered: 08/23/2023 04:36 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Entry of Appearance for Robert L. Florence; Tasneem A. Dharamsi; Elizabeth M. Crompton as counsel for Appellant USV Private Limited. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945394] [23-2254] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 36 ]. [Robert Florence] [Entered: 08/23/2023 04:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945362] [23-2254] [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 08/23/2023 03:41 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945360] [23-2254] [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 08/23/2023 03:38 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Corrected Entry of Appearance for Sarah M. Harris; Stanley E. Fisher; Shaun P. Mahaffy; David M. Krinsky; Aaron Gleaton Clay; as counsel for Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945355] [23-2254] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 35 ]. [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 08/23/2023 03:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Entry of Appearance for Dmitry V. Shelhoff; Kenneth S. Canfield; Edward D. Pergament; Julia S. Kim as counsel for Appellants Mankind Pharma Ltd. and Lifestar Pharma LLC. Service: 08/23/2023 by email. [945248] [23-2254] [Dmitry Shelhoff] [Entered: 08/23/2023 12:23 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/28/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [944411] [JPS] [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:12 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Entry of Appearance for Sarah M. Harris; Stanley E. Fisher; David M. Krinsky; Shaun P. Mahaffy; Aaron Gleaton Clay as counsel for Appellees Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. and Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC. Service: 08/17/2023 by email. [944100] [23-2254] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 4 ] [Sarah Harris] [Entered: 08/17/2023 05:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Entry of Appearance for Charles B. Klein; Jovial Wong as counsel for Appellants Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. Service: 08/16/2023 by email. [943618] [23-2254] [Charles Klein] [Entered: 08/16/2023 03:03 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/03/2023. [941812] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/23/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/23/2023. Docketing Statement is due on 08/23/2023. Appellants' brief is due on 10/10/2023. [ALK] [Entered: 08/09/2023 02:53 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less