This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/19/2023 at 06:03:23 (UTC).

Williams v. Medtronic, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 Williams filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1786

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SABRINA M. WILLIAMS

Defendant / Appellee

MEDTRONIC, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sabrina M. Williams

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ellen Lemire

Michael Mankes

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

NOTICE of filing with Clerk's Office filed by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Certificate of service was not included. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 09/27/2023 02:45 PM]

Open Document

COURTESY COPY of first page of plaintiff's response filed in District Court filed by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Certificate of service was not included. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 09/29/2023 04:27 PM]

Open Document

COURTESY COPY of Plaintiff's Response to Judge Myong J. Joun filed in District Court filed by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Served on 09/29/2023. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 10/05/2023 01:13 PM]

Open Document #1

Appellant's Brief

Open Document #2

Appellee's Briefing Notice

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2023

DocketPLEADING tendered: Ex Parte motion filed provisionally under seal by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Served on 11/10/2023. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 11/15/2023 10:21 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Number of copies: 1. Served on 10/24/2023. Brief due 11/24/2023 for APPELLEE Medtronic, Inc. [23-1786] (AVN) [Entered: 10/25/2023 02:02 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOURTESY COPY of Plaintiff's Response to Judge Myong J. Joun filed in District Court filed by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Served on 09/29/2023. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 10/05/2023 01:13 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOURTESY COPY of first page of plaintiff's response filed in District Court filed by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Certificate of service was not included. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 09/29/2023 04:27 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE of filing with Clerk's Office filed by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Certificate of service was not included. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 09/27/2023 02:45 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 10/31/2023 for appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 09/21/2023 01:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #21) filed by Appellant Sabrina M. Williams. Fee due 10/04/2023. [23-1786] (JMK) [Entered: 09/20/2023 02:55 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less