This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/13/2023 at 06:01:13 (UTC).

Polanco v. Porter

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 Polanco filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Porter. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-373

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Onaney Polanco, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of A.D.

Defendant / Appellees

Meisha Porter, in her Official Capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education

New York City Department of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ashleigh C. Rousseau Esq.

Rory Jude Bellantoni Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Janet L. Zaleon

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/28/2023, RECEIVED.[3485706] [23-373] [Entered: 03/17/2023 05:06 PM]

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/22/2023 by CM/ECF.[3487766] [23-373] [Entered: 03/22/2023 12:56 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/22/2023 by CM/ECF. [3487794] [23-373] [Entered: 03/22/2023 01:25 PM]

#12

(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/28/2023 by CM/ECF.[3490865] [23-373] [Entered: 03/28/2023 06:40 PM]

#13

(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [11], on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED.[3491303] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 01:49 PM]

#14

(#14) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/29/2023 by CM/ECF.[3491311] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 01:58 PM]

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter, FILED. Service date 03/29/2023 by CM/ECF. [3491452] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 03:30 PM]

#19

(#19) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/05/2023, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3491592] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 05:05 PM]

#23

(#23) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3493585] [23-373] [Entered: 04/03/2023 02:45 PM]

#25

(#25) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 04/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3498966] [23-373] [Entered: 04/13/2023 03:30 PM]

#28

(#28) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Onaney Polanco Brief due date as 06/07/2023. Joint Appendix due date as 06/07/2023, FILED.[3499213] [23-373] [Entered: 04/14/2023 08:46 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Onaney Polanco Brief due date as 06/07/2023. Joint Appendix due date as 06/07/2023, FILED.[3499213] [23-373] [Entered: 04/14/2023 08:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 04/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3498966] [23-373] [Entered: 04/13/2023 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3493585] [23-373] [Entered: 04/03/2023 02:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY, Janet L. Zaleon, [ # 17 ], in place of attorney Sylvia Hinds-Radix, SUBSTITUTED.[3493310] [23-373] [Entered: 04/03/2023 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/05/2023, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3491592] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 05:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter, FILED. Service date 03/29/2023 by CM/ECF. [3491452] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 13 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED.[3491384] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/29/2023 by CM/ECF.[3491311] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 01:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [11], on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED.[3491303] [23-373] [Entered: 03/29/2023 01:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/28/2023 by CM/ECF.[3490865] [23-373] [Entered: 03/28/2023 06:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • Docket(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/28/2023 by CM/ECF.[3490852] [23-373] [Entered: 03/28/2023 05:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Rory Jude Bellantoni for Onaney Polanco, in case 23-373 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3490245] [23-373] [Entered: 03/28/2023 09:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/22/2023 by CM/ECF. [3487794] [23-373] [Entered: 03/22/2023 01:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. Service date 03/22/2023 by CM/ECF.[3487766] [23-373] [Entered: 03/22/2023 12:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, district court receipt # ANYSDC-27464607, FILED.[3485711] [23-373] [Entered: 03/17/2023 05:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3485707] [23-373] [Entered: 03/17/2023 05:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/28/2023, RECEIVED.[3485706] [23-373] [Entered: 03/17/2023 05:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Onaney Polanco, FILED. [3485703] [23-373] [Entered: 03/17/2023 05:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less