This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/11/2023 at 06:15:54 (UTC).

In re: Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 In re Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1665

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUJAN CLAIMANTS

Defendants

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO OF PITTSBURGH PENNSYLVANIA

LEXINGTON INSURANCE CO

LANDMARK INSURANCE CO

INSURANCE CO OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA

TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY CO

ST PAUL SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO

GULF INSURANCE CO

GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY CO

INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE CO

MUNICH REINSURANCE AMERICA INC

ARCH INSURANCE CO

GEMINI INSURANCE CO

D & V CLAIMANTS

ARROWOOD INDEMNITY

ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO

NATIONAL SURETY CORP

Debtor / Appellees

In re: BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA

DELAWARE BSA LLC

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher D. Loizides Esq.

Defendant Attorneys

Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.

Richard J. Doren Esq.

Blaine H. Evanson Esq.

Susan N. Gummow Esq.

James L. Hallowell Esq.

Mitchell A. Karlan Esq.

Deirdre Richards Esq.

Seth M. Rokosky Esq.

Michael A. Rosenthal Esq.

Louis J. Rizzo Esq. Jr.

Mary E. Borja Esq.

Ashley-Anne Criss Esq.

Kathleen M. Miller Esq.

Lloyd A. Gura Esq.

Debtor / Appellee Attorneys

Sophie R. Churchill Esq.

Tori L. Remington Esq.

64 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Appellants' counsel. (SB) [Entered: 05/25/2023 04:40 PM]

#44

(#44) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Liberty Surplus Insurance and Ohio Casualty Insurance Co filed by Attorney Preston Bruno, Esq. for Appellants Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Liberty Surplus Insurance and Ohio Casualty Insurance Co to withdraw as counsel. Certificate of Service dated 05/23/2023. Service made by ECF. [23-1665] (PB) [Entered: 05/23/2023 01:25 PM]

#56

(#43) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David Elbaum on behalf of Appellee(s) Federal Insurance Company and Westchester Fire Insurance Company. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (DE) [Entered: 05/16/2023 01:19 PM]

55 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

55 #1

Standing Order

#54

(#41) ORDER (Clerk) No action will be taken on the Letter by Non-Party Nathaniel Marshall Requesting Denial of Appeals. Nathaniel Marshall was not a party to the underlying district-court proceedings. Accordingly, Mr. Marshall cannot participate in these appeals unless this Court allows him to intervene. If Mr. Marshall seeks to intervene in these appeals, he must file a motion requesting that relief.[23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (SB) [Entered: 05/08/2023 02:38 PM]

#52

(#39) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen Warren on behalf of Appellee(s) Century Indemnity Company. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (SHW) [Entered: 05/05/2023 11:21 AM]

#51

(#38) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tancred Schiavoni on behalf of Appellee(s) Century Indemnity Company. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (TVS) [Entered: 05/04/2023 11:05 PM]

#50

(#37) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Hacker on behalf of Appellee(s) Century Indemnity Company. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (JDH) [Entered: 05/04/2023 10:46 PM]

#3

(#3) Joinder by Appellants in Emergency Motion of Insurers for a Stay Pending Apeal and a Temporary Stay While the Court Rules on the Motion. (LML) [Entered: 04/12/2023 10:21 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order re Excess Pagination

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Opinion

#1

Notice of Appeal

#25

(#5) ORDER (Clerk) At the direction of the Court, the temporary stay issued in the appeals at Nos. 23-1664, 23-1666, and 23-1668 also applies to the appeals at Nos. 23-1665, 23-1667, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, and 23-1678. This order does not constitute a ruling on the merits of the parties stay motions nor a need for more than a temporary stay. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678] (SB) [Entered: 04/12/2023 03:45 PM]

#24

(#4) CLERK ORDER The appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees briefs, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. The parties are hereby directed to electronically file documents on the Courts docket as follows: Appellants: All case opening forms, motions, and briefs must be filed only in the appeal number assigned to the filers notice of appeal. If a document is being filed jointly by multiple appellants, the document must be filed only in the appeal numbers assigned to the filing appellants. Appellees: All case opening forms must be filed in all appeals in which the appellee intends to participate. All motions should be filed only in those cases for which the relief is being requested. Each appellees consolidated brief must be filed in all appeals to which the appellee is responding. The consolidated joint appendix must be filed in all appeal numbers. The parties are advised that case opening forms for later filed appeals must only be filed in the new appeals and not re-filed in earlier appeals in which the forms were previously filed. The parties are further advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document.. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678] (SB) [Entered: 04/12/2023 03:44 PM]

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2023

Docket(#46) Appellants in Nos. 23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, and 23-1780 verbally granted an extension of time to file brief(s) and appendix(es) until 07/10/2023 pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 31.4. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780]. (ARR) [Entered: 05/26/2023 09:52 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#45) ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Appellants' counsel. (SB) [Entered: 05/25/2023 04:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#44) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Liberty Surplus Insurance and Ohio Casualty Insurance Co filed by Attorney Preston Bruno, Esq. for Appellants Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Liberty Surplus Insurance and Ohio Casualty Insurance Co to withdraw as counsel. Certificate of Service dated 05/23/2023. Service made by ECF. [23-1665] (PB) [Entered: 05/23/2023 01:25 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#43) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David Elbaum on behalf of Appellee(s) Federal Insurance Company and Westchester Fire Insurance Company. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (DE) [Entered: 05/16/2023 01:19 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#42) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Lujan Claimants, Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Liberty Surplus Insurance, Ohio Casualty Insurance Co, D & V Claimants, Columbia Casualty Co, Continental Insurance Co, Insurance Co of the State of Pennsylvania, Landmark Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh Pennsylvania, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Old Republic Insurance Co, Gulf Insurance Co, St Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Co, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co, Great American Assurance Co, Great American E&S Insurance Co, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co, Interstate Fire & Casualty Co, National Surety Corp, Argonaut Insurance Co, Gemini Insurance Co, General Star Indemnity Co, Arrowood Indemnity, Endurance American Insurance Co, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Co, Traders and Pacific Insurane Co and Arch Insurance Co due on or before 06/26/2023. Appendix due on or before 06/26/2023. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (SB) [Entered: 05/15/2023 02:12 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) ORDER (Clerk) No action will be taken on the Letter by Non-Party Nathaniel Marshall Requesting Denial of Appeals. Nathaniel Marshall was not a party to the underlying district-court proceedings. Accordingly, Mr. Marshall cannot participate in these appeals unless this Court allows him to intervene. If Mr. Marshall seeks to intervene in these appeals, he must file a motion requesting that relief.[23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (SB) [Entered: 05/08/2023 02:38 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen Warren on behalf of Appellee(s) Century Indemnity Company. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (SHW) [Entered: 05/05/2023 11:21 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tancred Schiavoni on behalf of Appellee(s) Century Indemnity Company. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (TVS) [Entered: 05/04/2023 11:05 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Hacker on behalf of Appellee(s) Century Indemnity Company. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678, 23-1780] (JDH) [Entered: 05/04/2023 10:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stamatios Stamoulis on behalf of Appellee(s) Century Indemnity Company, Federal Insurance Company, and Westchester Fire Insurance Company. [23-1665] (SS) [Entered: 05/04/2023 07:00 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Preston F. Bruno on behalf of Appellant(s) Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., and Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. [23-1665] (PB) [Entered: 04/14/2023 03:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Marshall on behalf of Appellant(s) Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., and Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. [23-1665] (JDM) [Entered: 04/14/2023 03:31 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Ohio Casualty Insurance Co, Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc and Liberty Surplus Insurance. [23-1665] (DRG) [Entered: 04/14/2023 03:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Douglas R. Gooding on behalf of Appellant(s) Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., and Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. [23-1665] (DRG) [Entered: 04/14/2023 03:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC. [23-1665] (TLR) [Entered: 04/13/2023 02:56 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER (Clerk) At the direction of the Court, the temporary stay issued in the appeals at Nos. 23-1664, 23-1666, and 23-1668 also applies to the appeals at Nos. 23-1665, 23-1667, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, and 23-1678. This order does not constitute a ruling on the merits of the parties stay motions nor a need for more than a temporary stay. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678] (SB) [Entered: 04/12/2023 03:45 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CLERK ORDER The appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees briefs, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. The parties are hereby directed to electronically file documents on the Courts docket as follows: Appellants: All case opening forms, motions, and briefs must be filed only in the appeal number assigned to the filers notice of appeal. If a document is being filed jointly by multiple appellants, the document must be filed only in the appeal numbers assigned to the filing appellants. Appellees: All case opening forms must be filed in all appeals in which the appellee intends to participate. All motions should be filed only in those cases for which the relief is being requested. Each appellees consolidated brief must be filed in all appeals to which the appellee is responding. The consolidated joint appendix must be filed in all appeal numbers. The parties are advised that case opening forms for later filed appeals must only be filed in the new appeals and not re-filed in earlier appeals in which the forms were previously filed. The parties are further advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document.. [23-1664, 23-1665, 23-1666, 23-1667, 23-1668, 23-1669, 23-1670, 23-1671, 23-1672, 23-1673, 23-1674, 23-1675, 23-1676, 23-1677, 23-1678] (SB) [Entered: 04/12/2023 03:44 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Joinder by Appellants in Emergency Motion of Insurers for a Stay Pending Apeal and a Temporary Stay While the Court Rules on the Motion. (LML) [Entered: 04/12/2023 10:21 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LML) [Entered: 04/12/2023 10:19 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Liberty Surplus Insurance and Ohio Casualty Insurance Co in District Court No. 1-22-cv-01237. (LML) [Entered: 04/12/2023 10:00 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less