This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/13/2023 at 06:01:59 (UTC).

Raj Patel v. Alphabet, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Raj Patel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alphabet, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-16181

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RAJ PATEL

Defendant / Appellees

ALPHABET, INC.

GOOGLE, LLC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, a Governmental Entity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Raj Patel

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Kelly M. Knoll

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Additional Document

2 #3

Additional Document

2 #4

Additional Document

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Redacted Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 09/24/2023. [12797832] [23-16181] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 09/25/2023 by TYL] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 09/24/2023 02:55 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Amended EMERGENCY Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 10/02/2023. [12802021] [23-16181] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 10/02/2023 by TYL] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/02/2023 05:02 AM]

8 #1

Main Document

8 #2

Frivolous OSC Forms

#10

(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Correspondence: why appeal should go forward. Date of service: 10/12/2023 [12808420] [23-16181] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/12/2023 07:37 AM]

#11

(#11) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Raj Patel. Date of service: 10/21/2023. [12813455] [23-16181]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed PDF of the motion. See [ # 13 ]. 10/23/2023 by KWG] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/21/2023 08:37 AM]

#13

(#13) Filed Appellant Raj Patel motion to file substitute or corrected brief. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/22/2023. (Court entered filing, incorrectly filed in [ # 11 ] and [12].) [12813917] (KWG) [Entered: 10/23/2023 02:25 PM]

#14

(#14) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Correspondence: Default Judgement In Miss. Hinds Cir. Ct. $4.6-9B. Date of service: 10/29/2023 [12816770] [23-16181] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/29/2023 06:43 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Correspondence: Default Judgement In Miss. Hinds Cir. Ct. $4.6-9B. Date of service: 10/29/2023 [12816770] [23-16181] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/29/2023 06:43 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Filed Appellant Raj Patel motion to file substitute or corrected brief. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/22/2023. (Court entered filing, incorrectly filed in [ # 11 ] and [12].) [12813917] (KWG) [Entered: 10/23/2023 02:25 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 13 ] and [ # 11 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Correspondence: Second Am. Br.. Date of service: 10/22/2023 [12813460] [23-16181] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/22/2023 01:48 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Raj Patel. Date of service: 10/21/2023. [12813455] [23-16181]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed PDF of the motion. See [ # 13 ]. 10/23/2023 by KWG] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/21/2023 08:37 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Correspondence: why appeal should go forward. Date of service: 10/12/2023 [12808420] [23-16181] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/12/2023 07:37 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

Docket(#9) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 10 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel answer to Miscellaneous petition. Date of service: 10/11/2023. [12808260] [23-16181] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/11/2023 03:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MCD): A review of the record reflects that this appeal may be frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), OR (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not move to dismiss this appeal, the court may dismiss the appeal as frivolous, without further notice. Any determination of whether the appeal is frivolous will be based on the substitute opening brief received on September 19, 2023, and appellants statement, if any, in response to this order. The court has received appellants September 18, 2023 motion to file the brief under seal and the proposed brief. The Clerk will maintain the September 19, 2023 submissions (Docket Entry No. [4]) under provisional seal, and the motion to seal will be addressed by separate order. The Clerk will strike the prior opening brief previously submitted on September 15, 2023 (Docket Entry No. [2]). Appellants motions to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 6 ], [ # 7 ]) are denied. Briefing is suspended pending disposition of this order to show cause and the motion to seal. The Clerk will serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, and (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, or statement that the appeal should go forward. [12808209] (JMR) [Entered: 10/11/2023 03:07 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Amended EMERGENCY Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 10/02/2023. [12802021] [23-16181] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 10/02/2023 by TYL] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 10/02/2023 05:02 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raj Patel Redacted Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 09/24/2023. [12797832] [23-16181] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 09/25/2023 by TYL] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 09/24/2023 02:55 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

Docket(#5) COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [4]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Raj Patel motion to file document under seal and submit sealed document. Type of document: brief. Date of service: 09/20/2023. [12795491] [23-16181] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 09/20/2023 08:57 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Raj Patel motion to file document under seal and submit sealed document. Type of document: brief and motion (to file substitute brief). Date of service: 09/19/2023. [12794943] [23-16181]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached motion to seal, originally filed in [5]. Updated docket text to reflect correct document types. 09/20/2023 by KWG] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 09/19/2023 12:05 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Raj Patel notice of filing document under seal. Type of document: brief. Date of service: 09/18/2023. [12794067] [23-16181] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 09/18/2023 01:05 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

Docket(#2) STRICKEN PER ORDER [ # 8 ]. Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Raj Patel. Date of service: 09/15/2023. [12793133] [23-16181]--[COURT UPDATE: Locked PDF pending resolution of motion to seal. 09/20/2023 by KWG] (Patel, Raj) [Entered: 09/15/2023 11:41 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Raj K. Patel opening brief due 11/16/2023. Appellees Alphabet, Inc., Google, LLC and United States of America answering brief due 12/18/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12792213] (RT) [Entered: 09/14/2023 11:22 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less