This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/27/2023 at 06:01:38 (UTC).

John Berkery, Sr. v. Experian plc, et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2023 John Berkery, Sr filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian plc,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-2522

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Defendants

EXPERIAN PLC

EQUIFAX INC, AKA Equifax Information Services LLC

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC

FIRST PREMIER BANK

UNITED NATIONAL CORP

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN C. BERKERY, SR.

Defendant / Appellee

TRANSUNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin Esq.

Kelly M. Locher Esq.

Jakob F. Williams Esq.

Lauren L. Schuler Esq.

Jenny N. Perkins Esq.

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John C. Berkery Sr.

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Casey B. Green Esq.

William M. Huse Esq.

Camille R. Nicodemus Esq.

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Memorandum (Doc 105)

1 #3

District Court Order (Doc 106)

1 #4

District Court Order (Doc 107)

1 #5

District Court Order (Doc 108)

1 #6

Case Caption

1 #7

Case Opening Letter

#3

(#3) NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) [Entered: 08/28/2023 01:04 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Appellee(s) Trans Union, LLC. [23-2522] (CRN) [Entered: 08/29/2023 04:00 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee TransUnion. [23-2522] (CRN) [Entered: 08/29/2023 04:02 PM]

#6

(#6) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc, Kelly M. Locher, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc, Jenny N. Perkins, Esq. for Appellees First Premier Bank and United National Corp, Lauren L. Schuler, Esq. for Appellee Verizon Communications Inc and Jakob F. Williams, Esq. for Appellee Equifax Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 09/27/2023. (JK) [Entered: 09/13/2023 01:15 PM]

#7

(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc, Kelly M. Locher, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc, Jenny N. Perkins, Esq. for Appellees First Premier Bank and United National Corp, Lauren L. Schuler, Esq. for Appellee Verizon Communications Inc and Jakob F. Williams, Esq. for Appellee Equifax Inc requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 09/27/2023. (JK) [Entered: 09/13/2023 01:26 PM]

#9

(#9) LETTER filed by Appellant John C. Berkery, Sr.. (JK) [Entered: 09/18/2023 04:31 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc Letter advising that Experian is not participating in this appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 09/15/2023. Service made by ECF. [23-2522] (MAG) [Entered: 09/15/2023 11:18 AM]

#10

(#10) CLERK LETTER SENT to Appellant John C. Berkery, Sr. in response to Appellant's 9/14/2023 Letter (JK) [Entered: 09/18/2023 04:46 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: Jenny N. Perkins, Esq. for First Premier Bank and United National Corp Appellees First Premier Bank and United National Corp will not participate in this appeal, received. [23-2522] (JNP) [Entered: 09/19/2023 10:47 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: Jenny N. Perkins, Esq. for First Premier Bank and United National Corp Appellees First Premier Bank and United National Corp will not participate in this appeal, received. [23-2522] (JNP) [Entered: 09/19/2023 10:47 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CLERK LETTER SENT to Appellant John C. Berkery, Sr. in response to Appellant's 9/14/2023 Letter (JK) [Entered: 09/18/2023 04:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc Letter advising that Experian is not participating in this appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 09/15/2023. Service made by ECF. [23-2522] (MAG) [Entered: 09/15/2023 11:18 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) LETTER filed by Appellant John C. Berkery, Sr.. (JK) [Entered: 09/18/2023 04:31 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc, Kelly M. Locher, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc, Jenny N. Perkins, Esq. for Appellees First Premier Bank and United National Corp, Lauren L. Schuler, Esq. for Appellee Verizon Communications Inc and Jakob F. Williams, Esq. for Appellee Equifax Inc requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 09/27/2023. (JK) [Entered: 09/13/2023 01:26 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc, Kelly M. Locher, Esq. for Appellee Experian plc, Jenny N. Perkins, Esq. for Appellees First Premier Bank and United National Corp, Lauren L. Schuler, Esq. for Appellee Verizon Communications Inc and Jakob F. Williams, Esq. for Appellee Equifax Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 09/27/2023. (JK) [Entered: 09/13/2023 01:15 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee TransUnion. [23-2522] (CRN) [Entered: 08/29/2023 04:02 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Appellee(s) Trans Union, LLC. [23-2522] (CRN) [Entered: 08/29/2023 04:00 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) [Entered: 08/28/2023 01:04 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 08/28/2023 12:58 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant John C. Berkery, Sr. in District Court No. 2-21-cv-01250. (JK) [Entered: 08/28/2023 12:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less