This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/20/2023 at 18:32:12 (UTC).

Lynk Labs, Inc. v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2023 Lynk Labs, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-2030

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

LYNK LABS, INC.

Appellee

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Minghui Yang

James Carmichael

Stephen McBride

Stephen Terry Schreiner

Appellee Attorneys

Brian K. Erickson

Nicholas G. Papastavros

Jennifer Librach Nall

Stanley Joseph Panikowski III

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Entry of Appearance for James T. Carmichael; Stephen T. Schreiner; Stephen P. McBride; Minghui Yang as counsel for Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2023 by email. [931360] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/21/2023 12:57 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2023 by email. [931361] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/21/2023 12:59 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2023 by email. [931362] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/21/2023 01:02 PM]

#5

(#5) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2023 by email. [931364] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/21/2023 01:04 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of Appearance for Nicholas G. Papastavros; Jennifer Librach Nall; Brian K. Erickson; Stanley J. Panikowski as counsel for Appellee Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 06/29/2023 by email. [933247] [23-2030] [Nicholas Papastavros] [Entered: 06/29/2023 03:27 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 06/29/2023 by email. [933248] [23-2030] [Nicholas Papastavros] [Entered: 06/29/2023 03:28 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 06/29/2023 by email. [933249] [23-2030] [Nicholas Papastavros] [Entered: 06/29/2023 03:29 PM]

#9

(#9) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellee Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 06/29/2023 by email. [933250] [23-2030] [Nicholas Papastavros] [Entered: 06/29/2023 03:30 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION of Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc. to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Service: 07/21/2023 by email. [937566] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 07/21/2023 11:10 AM]

#11

(#11) Certified list received. Service: 07/25/2023 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [938358] [JPS] [Entered: 07/25/2023 01:47 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 10 ] filed by Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc..; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [938774] [CAB] [Entered: 07/27/2023 09:32 AM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 10 ] filed by Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc..; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [938774] [CAB] [Entered: 07/27/2023 09:32 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Certified list received. Service: 07/25/2023 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [938358] [JPS] [Entered: 07/25/2023 01:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION of Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc. to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Service: 07/21/2023 by email. [937566] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 07/21/2023 11:10 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellee Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 06/29/2023 by email. [933250] [23-2030] [Nicholas Papastavros] [Entered: 06/29/2023 03:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 06/29/2023 by email. [933249] [23-2030] [Nicholas Papastavros] [Entered: 06/29/2023 03:29 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 06/29/2023 by email. [933248] [23-2030] [Nicholas Papastavros] [Entered: 06/29/2023 03:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Entry of Appearance for Nicholas G. Papastavros; Jennifer Librach Nall; Brian K. Erickson; Stanley J. Panikowski as counsel for Appellee Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 06/29/2023 by email. [933247] [23-2030] [Nicholas Papastavros] [Entered: 06/29/2023 03:27 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2023 by email. [931364] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/21/2023 01:04 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2023 by email. [931362] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/21/2023 01:02 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2023 by email. [931361] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/21/2023 12:59 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Entry of Appearance for James T. Carmichael; Stephen T. Schreiner; Stephen P. McBride; Minghui Yang as counsel for Appellant Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2023 by email. [931360] [23-2030] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/21/2023 12:57 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/12/2023. [930413] Entry of Appearance is due on 06/29/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/29/2023. Docketing Statement is due on 06/29/2023. Certified List is due on 07/25/2023. [CMH] [Entered: 06/15/2023 03:52 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less