This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/10/2023 at 06:02:36 (UTC).

American Reliable Insurance Company, et al v. USA

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 American Reliable Insurance Company, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-5439

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

AMERICAN RELIABLE INSURANCE COMPANY

UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE CO.

AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

STANDARD GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN

FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

FOREMOST SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY

STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY

STATE FARM GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM INSURANCE MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew J. Evans

Daniel C. Headrick

Mark S. Grotefeld

Jonathan Tofilon

Other Attorneys

Evan B. Stephenson

Jeffrey Eric Sandberg

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant USA. Transcript needed: y. (GSA) [Entered: 05/11/2023 03:58 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER filed : Upon consideration of the joint motion for the parties to consolidate for briefing and submission [ # 6953066-2 ], It is ORDERED that the motion is granted in part, insofar as a cross-appeal briefing schedule shall issue separately for Case Nos. 22-6014 and 23-5439 once all required case opening forms are filed in 23-5439. [22-6014, 23-5439] (GSA) [Entered: 05/17/2023 09:54 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company Of America by Jonathan J. Tofilon. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2023. [23-5439] (JT) [Entered: 05/18/2023 12:52 PM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Property-Owners Insurance Company, Southern-Owners Insurance Company by Evan Stephenson. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2023. [23-5439]--[Edited 05/18/2023 by GSA] (EBS) [Entered: 05/18/2023 03:25 PM]

#10

(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Eric Sandberg for Appellee Cross-Appellant USA.. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2023. [23-5439] (JES) [Entered: 05/19/2023 01:55 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company Of America by Mark S. Grotefeld. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2023. [23-5439] (MSG) [Entered: 05/19/2023 02:19 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Co., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company Of America, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, First National Insurance Company of America, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company, USAA, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and USAA General Indemnity Company by Matthew J. Evans. Certificate of Service: 05/25/2023. [23-5439] (MJE) [Entered: 05/25/2023 11:13 AM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Co., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company Of America, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, First National Insurance Company of America, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, Southern-Owners Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company, USAA, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and USAA General Indemnity Company by Daniel C. Headrick. Certificate of Service: 05/25/2023. [23-5439] (DCH) [Entered: 05/25/2023 11:20 AM]

#14

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant USA by Jeffrey E. Sandberg. Certificate of Service: 05/26/2023. [23-5439] (JES) [Entered: 05/26/2023 10:59 AM]

17 #1

first brief

17 #2

Exhibit A

#18

(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: second brief due 07/03/2023; third brief due 08/02/2023; fourth brief due 08/23/2023. [22-6014, 23-5439] (GSA) [Entered: 06/02/2023 10:05 AM]

#19

(#19) MOTION filed by Mr. Jeffrey Eric Sandberg for USA in 22-6014, 23-5439 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 06/22/2023. [22-6014, 23-5439] (JES) [Entered: 06/22/2023 12:13 AM]

#20

(#20) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 19 ] by 21 days, filed by Mr. Jeffrey Eric Sandberg. Resetting briefing schedule: second brief now due 07/24/2023; third brief now due 08/23/2023; fourth brief now due 09/13/2023. [22-6014, 23-5439] (GSA) [Entered: 06/22/2023 11:16 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 19 ] by 21 days, filed by Mr. Jeffrey Eric Sandberg. Resetting briefing schedule: second brief now due 07/24/2023; third brief now due 08/23/2023; fourth brief now due 09/13/2023. [22-6014, 23-5439] (GSA) [Entered: 06/22/2023 11:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION filed by Mr. Jeffrey Eric Sandberg for USA in 22-6014, 23-5439 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 06/22/2023. [22-6014, 23-5439] (JES) [Entered: 06/22/2023 12:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: second brief due 07/03/2023; third brief due 08/02/2023; fourth brief due 08/23/2023. [22-6014, 23-5439] (GSA) [Entered: 06/02/2023 10:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FIRST BRIEF filed by Mr. Matthew J. Evans for AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Co., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company Of America, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, First National Insurance Company of America, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company, USAA, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and USAA General Indemnity Company in 22-6014, Mr. Matthew J. Evans for American Reliable Insurance Company, United National Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Co., American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Nautilus Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, USAA, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company Of America in 23-5439. Certificate of Service: 06/02/2023. Argument Request: requested. [22-6014, 23-5439] (MJE) [Entered: 06/02/2023 09:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Docket(#16) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Jeffrey Eric Sandberg for USA. Certificate of Service: 05/30/2023. [23-5439] (JES) [Entered: 05/30/2023 12:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant USA by Jeffrey E. Sandberg. Certificate of Service: 05/26/2023. [23-5439] (JES) [Entered: 05/26/2023 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LOCKED ** FORM SHOULD ONLY BE FILED IN CASE NO. 23-5439 ** PLEASE UNCHECK CASE NO. 22-6014 AND REFILE IN 23-5439 ONLY ** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant USA in 23-5439 by Jeffrey E. Sandberg. Certificate of Service: 05/26/2023. [23-5439, 22-6014]--[Edited 05/26/2023 by GSA] (JES) [Entered: 05/26/2023 10:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Co., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company Of America, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, First National Insurance Company of America, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, Southern-Owners Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company, USAA, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and USAA General Indemnity Company by Daniel C. Headrick. Certificate of Service: 05/25/2023. [23-5439] (DCH) [Entered: 05/25/2023 11:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Co., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company Of America, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, First National Insurance Company of America, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company, USAA, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and USAA General Indemnity Company by Matthew J. Evans. Certificate of Service: 05/25/2023. [23-5439] (MJE) [Entered: 05/25/2023 11:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company Of America by Mark S. Grotefeld. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2023. [23-5439] (MSG) [Entered: 05/19/2023 02:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Eric Sandberg for Appellee Cross-Appellant USA.. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2023. [23-5439] (JES) [Entered: 05/19/2023 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Property-Owners Insurance Company, Southern-Owners Insurance Company by Evan Stephenson. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2023. [23-5439]--[Edited 05/18/2023 by GSA] (EBS) [Entered: 05/18/2023 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LOCKED ** FORM IS IN EDITABLE FORMAT ** PLEASE REFILE BY PRINTING TO PDF, SAVING, AND UPLOADING ** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Auto-Owners Insurance Company by Evan Stephenson. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2023. [23-5439]--[Edited 05/18/2023 by GSA] (EBS) [Entered: 05/18/2023 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LOCKED ** APPEARANCE FORM MUST BE FILED BY ATTORNEY USING THEIR OWN PACER ACCOUNT ** PLEASE REFILE ** APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company Of America by Mark S. Grotefeld. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2023. [23-5439]--[Edited 05/18/2023 by GSA] (JT) [Entered: 05/18/2023 01:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cross-Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company Of America by Jonathan J. Tofilon. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2023. [23-5439] (JT) [Entered: 05/18/2023 12:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER filed : Upon consideration of the joint motion for the parties to consolidate for briefing and submission [ # 6953066-2 ], It is ORDERED that the motion is granted in part, insofar as a cross-appeal briefing schedule shall issue separately for Case Nos. 22-6014 and 23-5439 once all required case opening forms are filed in 23-5439. [22-6014, 23-5439] (GSA) [Entered: 05/17/2023 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • Docket(#3) Update fee status change to waived. (GSA) [Entered: 05/11/2023 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Gretchen Abruzzo (GSA) [Entered: 05/11/2023 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant USA. Transcript needed: y. (GSA) [Entered: 05/11/2023 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less