This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/06/2023 at 06:08:55 (UTC).

Cinemark Holdings v. Factory Mutual Ins

Case Summary

On 08/07/2023 Cinemark Holdings filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Factory Mutual Ins. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-40453

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated

Cinemark USA, Incorporated

CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C.

Century Theaters Incorporated

Cinemark Partners II Limited

Greely Limited

Laredo Theatre, Limited

Greeley Limited

Defendant / Appellee

Factory Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith Esq.

Michael S. Levine

Christopher J. Cunio

Joseph Thomas Niczky

Nicholas D. Stellakis

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James Vernon Chin

David Steven Coale Esq.

Emileigh S. Hubbard

Eric Wolf Pinker

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greely Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited [23-40453] (ABT) [Entered: 08/07/2023 02:47 PM]

#5

(#5) INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/23/2023 for Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greely Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited. [23-40453] (RLL) [Entered: 08/08/2023 01:45 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-40453] (Nicholas D. Stellakis ) [Entered: 08/17/2023 08:55 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-40453] (Christopher J. Cunio ) [Entered: 08/17/2023 09:03 AM]

#11

(#11) CASE CAPTION updated. Appellant Greely Limited in 23-40453 substituted by Appellant Greeley Limited in 23-40453 [23-40453] (ABT) [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:05 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-40453] (Michael S. Levine ) [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:17 AM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-40453] (Joseph Thomas Niczky ) [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:20 AM]

#14

(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [23-40453] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/21/2023 via US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Chin; email - Attorney for Appellants: Cunio, Smith, Stellakis; Attorney for Appellees: Hubbard, Pinker [23-40453] (Nicholas D. Stellakis ) [Entered: 08/21/2023 12:25 PM]

#19

(#19) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/04/2023 for Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited. [23-40453] (DDL) [Entered: 08/25/2023 10:58 AM]

#20

(#20) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-40453] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 08/29/2023 01:46 PM]

#23

(#23) MOTION filed by Appellee Factory Mutual Insurance Company to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 09/07/2023 [23-40453] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellants Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited for copy of record on appeal [23]. Date of service: 09/07/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Chin, Coale, Hubbard, Pinker; Attorney for Appellants: Cunio, Levine, Niczky, Smith, Stellakis [23-40453] (Michael S. Levine ) [Entered: 09/07/2023 01:22 PM]

29 #1

MOT-2 Letter

29 #2

Court Order

29 #3

Joint Motion

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2023

Docket(#30) EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited. Extension Granted to and including 11/03/2023. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/03/2023 for Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited. [23-40453] (RLL) [Entered: 09/15/2023 09:57 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) COURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellee Factory Mutual Insurance Company and Appellants Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Laredo Theatre, Limited and Greeley Limited [ # 23 ] [23-40453] (CCR) [Entered: 09/07/2023 04:08 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) MOTION filed by Appellee Factory Mutual Insurance Company to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 09/07/2023 [23-40453] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellants Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited for copy of record on appeal [23]. Date of service: 09/07/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Chin, Coale, Hubbard, Pinker; Attorney for Appellants: Cunio, Levine, Niczky, Smith, Stellakis [23-40453] (Michael S. Levine ) [Entered: 09/07/2023 01:22 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

Docket(#21) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David Steven Coale for party(s) Appellee Factory Mutual Insurance Company, in case 23-40453 [23-40453] (CCR) [Entered: 08/29/2023 02:12 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-40453] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 08/29/2023 01:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/04/2023 for Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited. [23-40453] (DDL) [Entered: 08/25/2023 10:58 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

Docket(#18) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [23-40453] (DDL) [Entered: 08/25/2023 10:57 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:21-CV-11. Electronic ROA due on 09/06/2023. [23-40453] (ABT) [Entered: 08/22/2023 11:11 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

Docket(#15) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joseph Thomas Niczky, Michael S. Levine for party(s) Appellant Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated Appellant Cinemark USA, Incorporated Appellant Greeley Limited Appellant Cinemark Partners II Limited Appellant Laredo Theatre, Limited Appellant CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C. Appellant Century Theaters Incorporated, in case 23-40453 [23-40453] (ABT) [Entered: 08/22/2023 11:09 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [23-40453] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Greeley Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/21/2023 via US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Chin; email - Attorney for Appellants: Cunio, Smith, Stellakis; Attorney for Appellees: Hubbard, Pinker [23-40453] (Nicholas D. Stellakis ) [Entered: 08/21/2023 12:25 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-40453] (Joseph Thomas Niczky ) [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:20 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-40453] (Michael S. Levine ) [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:17 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) CASE CAPTION updated. Appellant Greely Limited in 23-40453 substituted by Appellant Greeley Limited in 23-40453 [23-40453] (ABT) [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:05 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

Docket(#9) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher J. Cunio, Nicholas D. Stellakis for party(s) Appellant Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated Appellant Cinemark USA, Incorporated Appellant Cinemark Partners II Limited Appellant Greely Limited Appellant Laredo Theatre, Limited Appellant CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C. Appellant Century Theaters Incorporated, in case 23-40453 [23-40453] (ABT) [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:02 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-40453] (Christopher J. Cunio ) [Entered: 08/17/2023 09:03 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-40453] (Nicholas D. Stellakis ) [Entered: 08/17/2023 08:55 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

Docket(#6) Attorney James Chin added as counsel of record for Appellee Factory Mutual Insurance Company in 23-40453 [23-40453] (ABT) [Entered: 08/16/2023 09:48 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/23/2023 for Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greely Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited. [23-40453] (RLL) [Entered: 08/08/2023 01:45 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants CNMK Texas Properties, L.L.C., Century Theaters Incorporated, Cinemark Holdings, Incorporated, Cinemark Partners II Limited, Cinemark USA, Incorporated, Greely Limited and Laredo Theatre, Limited [23-40453] (ABT) [Entered: 08/07/2023 02:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less