This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/01/2023 at 06:02:06 (UTC).

Ilia Kolominsky, et al v. Root, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2023 Ilia Kolominsky, filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Root, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-3392

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ILIA KOLOMINSKY

BRYAN ANDERSON

Plaintiff / Appellant

PLUMBERS LOCAL 290 PENSION TRUST FUND, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

ROOT, INC.

ALEXANDER TIMM

DANIEL ROSENTHAL

MEGAN BINKLEY

CHRISTOPHER OLSEN

DOUG ULMAN

ELLIOT GEIDT

JERRI DEVARD

LARRY HILSHEIMER

LUIS VON AHN

NANCY KRAMER

NICK SHALEK

SCOTT MAW

BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC.

GOLDMAN SACHS & COMPANY, LLC

MORGAN STANLEY & COMPANY, LLC

WELLS FARGO SECURITIES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Steven Francis Hubachek

Michael Gerard Capeci

Joseph F. Murray

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

J. Wesley Earnhardt

William D. Kloss Jr.

Gregory A. Harrison

Sharon L. Nelles

Andrew John Finn

Kelly E. Pitcher

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Plumbers Local 290 Pension Trust Fund by Michael G. Capeci. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2023. [23-3392] (MGC) [Entered: 05/19/2023 04:49 PM]

#24

(#24) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [ # 23 ], resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/12/2023, appellee brief now due 08/11/2023. (ASM) [Entered: 05/19/2023 02:10 PM]

#23

(#23) MOTION filed by Mr. Steven Francis Hubachek for Plumbers Local 290 Pension Trust Fund to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2023. [23-3392] (SFH) [Entered: 05/19/2023 12:45 PM]

#22

(#22) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Gregory A. Harrison. Certificate of Service: 05/17/2023. [23-3392] (GAH) [Entered: 05/17/2023 02:19 PM]

#21

(#21) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Kelly E. Pitcher. Certificate of Service: 05/17/2023. [23-3392] (KEP) [Entered: 05/17/2023 02:16 PM]

#20

(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kelly E. Pitcher for Appellee Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392]--[Edited 05/17/2023 by RLB] (KEP) [Entered: 05/16/2023 09:31 PM]

#19

(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kelly E. Pitcher for Appellee Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392]--[Edited 05/17/2023 by RLB] (KEP) [Entered: 05/16/2023 06:32 PM]

#18

(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kelly E. Pitcher for Appellee Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392]--[Edited 05/17/2023 by RLB] (KEP) [Entered: 05/16/2023 06:30 PM]

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kelly E. Pitcher for Appellee Barclays Capital Inc.. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392]--[Edited 05/17/2023 by RLB] (KEP) [Entered: 05/16/2023 06:28 PM]

#16

(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC and Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC by Sharon L. Nelles. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392] (SLN) [Entered: 05/16/2023 04:50 PM]

#15

No Description Available

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Plumbers Local 290 Pension Trust Fund by Joseph F. Murray. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2023. [23-3392] (JFM) [Entered: 05/08/2023 12:25 PM]

#8

(#8) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 06/02/2023 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 05/05/2023 02:10 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Root, Inc., Alexander Timm, Daniel Rosenthal, Megan Binkley, Christopher Olsen, Doug Ulman, Elliot Geidt, Jerri DeVard, Larry Hilsheimer, Luis von Ahn, Nancy Kramer, Nick Shalek and Scott Maw by William D. Kloss, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/04/2023. [23-3392] (WDK) [Entered: 05/04/2023 11:08 AM]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Plumbers Local 290 Pension Trust Fund by Michael G. Capeci. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2023. [23-3392] (MGC) [Entered: 05/19/2023 04:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [ # 23 ], resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/12/2023, appellee brief now due 08/11/2023. (ASM) [Entered: 05/19/2023 02:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION filed by Mr. Steven Francis Hubachek for Plumbers Local 290 Pension Trust Fund to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2023. [23-3392] (SFH) [Entered: 05/19/2023 12:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Gregory A. Harrison. Certificate of Service: 05/17/2023. [23-3392] (GAH) [Entered: 05/17/2023 02:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Kelly E. Pitcher. Certificate of Service: 05/17/2023. [23-3392] (KEP) [Entered: 05/17/2023 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kelly E. Pitcher for Appellee Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392]--[Edited 05/17/2023 by RLB] (KEP) [Entered: 05/16/2023 09:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kelly E. Pitcher for Appellee Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392]--[Edited 05/17/2023 by RLB] (KEP) [Entered: 05/16/2023 06:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kelly E. Pitcher for Appellee Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392]--[Edited 05/17/2023 by RLB] (KEP) [Entered: 05/16/2023 06:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kelly E. Pitcher for Appellee Barclays Capital Inc.. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392]--[Edited 05/17/2023 by RLB] (KEP) [Entered: 05/16/2023 06:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC and Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC by Sharon L. Nelles. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2023. [23-3392] (SLN) [Entered: 05/16/2023 04:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Plumbers Local 290 Pension Trust Fund by Joseph F. Murray. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2023. [23-3392] (JFM) [Entered: 05/08/2023 12:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • Docket(#9) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 05/08/2023 09:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 06/02/2023 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 05/05/2023 02:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Root, Inc., Alexander Timm, Daniel Rosenthal, Megan Binkley, Christopher Olsen, Doug Ulman, Elliot Geidt, Jerri DeVard, Larry Hilsheimer, Luis von Ahn, Nancy Kramer, Nick Shalek and Scott Maw by William D. Kloss, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/04/2023. [23-3392] (WDK) [Entered: 05/04/2023 11:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Root, Inc., Alexander Timm, Daniel Rosenthal, Megan Binkley, Christopher Olsen, Doug Ulman, Elliot Geidt, Jerri DeVard, Larry Hilsheimer, Luis von Ahn, Nancy Kramer, Nick Shalek and Scott Maw by J. Wesley Earnhardt. Certificate of Service: 05/04/2023. [23-3392] (JWE) [Entered: 05/04/2023 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Plumbers Local 290 Pension Trust Fund by Steven F. Hubachek. Certificate of Service: 05/03/2023. [23-3392] (SFH) [Entered: 05/03/2023 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/03/2023 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/12/2023, appellee brief due 07/11/2023. (ASM) [Entered: 05/02/2023 10:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 05/02/2023 10:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Plumbers Local 290 Pension Trust Fund. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 05/02/2023 10:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less