This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/10/2023 at 06:06:24 (UTC).

Nichols Street, LLC v. Magaret Westbrook

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 Nichols Street, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Magaret Westbrook. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1944

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Appellee

MILONE & MACBROOM, INC.

Intervenors

NICHOLS STREET, LLC

SHERRY K. CORKUM

Receiver

MARGARET R. WESTBROOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Byron Saintsing

Joseph Alan Davies

Intervenor Attorneys

Kristen Atkins Lee

Donald G. Hunt Jr.

Receiver Attorneys

Zachary Scott Buckheit

Matthew Thomas Houston

Margaret R. Westbrook

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001465751] [23-1944] LHP [Entered: 11/01/2023 11:32 AM]

#18

(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 17 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 11/22/2023. Response brief due 12/27/2023. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001457539] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 10/18/2023 11:47 AM]

#17

(#17) MOTION by Sherry K. Corkum and Nichols Street, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 22 November 2023.. Date and method of service: 10/18/2023 ecf. [1001457460] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 10/18/2023 10:47 AM]

#16

(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Milone & MacBroom, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001457250] [23-1944] Byron Saintsing [Entered: 10/18/2023 08:20 AM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Byron L. Saintsing for Milone & MacBroom, Inc.. [1001456924] [23-1944] Byron Saintsing [Entered: 10/17/2023 01:17 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph A. Davies for Milone & MacBroom, Inc.. [1001456342] [23-1944] Joseph Davies [Entered: 10/16/2023 04:20 PM]

#13

(#13) Returned mail received from Milone & MacBroom, Inc. re [ # 12 ] for filing of appearance form. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? address updated and documents resent. [1001454723] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 10/12/2023 03:57 PM]

#12

(#12) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Milone & MacBroom, Inc. re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form. Forms due from Milone & MacBroom, Inc. on 10/10/2023. Mailed to: Byron Saintsing. [1001451486] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 10/05/2023 03:41 PM]

#11

(#11) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sherry K. Corkum and Nichols Street, LLC.. [1001444757] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:44 PM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nichols Street, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001444750] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:43 PM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sherry K. Corkum. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001444747] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:42 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald G. Hunt, Jr. for Sherry K. Corkum and Nichols Street, LLC. [1001444746] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:41 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kristen Atkins Lee for Sherry K. Corkum and Nichols Street, LLC. [1001444744] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:40 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Margaret R. Westbrook. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001442473] [23-1944] Zachary Buckheit [Entered: 09/20/2023 10:57 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zachary S Buckheit for Margaret R. Westbrook. [1001442465] [23-1944] Zachary Buckheit [Entered: 09/20/2023 10:53 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew T. Houston for Margaret R. Westbrook. [1001442457] [23-1944] Matthew Houston [Entered: 09/20/2023 10:48 AM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001436762] Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/23/2023. Response Brief due 11/20/2023. Mailed to: Kristen Lee, Byron Saintsing, Margaret Westbrook. [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 09/11/2023 02:55 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-mc-00028-D. Case manager: JeffNeal. [1001436757] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 09/11/2023 02:50 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001465751] [23-1944] LHP [Entered: 11/01/2023 11:32 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 17 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 11/22/2023. Response brief due 12/27/2023. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001457539] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 10/18/2023 11:47 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION by Sherry K. Corkum and Nichols Street, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 22 November 2023.. Date and method of service: 10/18/2023 ecf. [1001457460] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 10/18/2023 10:47 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Milone & MacBroom, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001457250] [23-1944] Byron Saintsing [Entered: 10/18/2023 08:20 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Byron L. Saintsing for Milone & MacBroom, Inc.. [1001456924] [23-1944] Byron Saintsing [Entered: 10/17/2023 01:17 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph A. Davies for Milone & MacBroom, Inc.. [1001456342] [23-1944] Joseph Davies [Entered: 10/16/2023 04:20 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Returned mail received from Milone & MacBroom, Inc. re [ # 12 ] for filing of appearance form. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? address updated and documents resent. [1001454723] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 10/12/2023 03:57 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Milone & MacBroom, Inc. re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form. Forms due from Milone & MacBroom, Inc. on 10/10/2023. Mailed to: Byron Saintsing. [1001451486] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 10/05/2023 03:41 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sherry K. Corkum and Nichols Street, LLC.. [1001444757] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:44 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nichols Street, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001444750] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:43 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sherry K. Corkum. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001444747] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:42 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald G. Hunt, Jr. for Sherry K. Corkum and Nichols Street, LLC. [1001444746] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:41 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kristen Atkins Lee for Sherry K. Corkum and Nichols Street, LLC. [1001444744] [23-1944] Kristen Lee [Entered: 09/25/2023 12:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Margaret R. Westbrook. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001442473] [23-1944] Zachary Buckheit [Entered: 09/20/2023 10:57 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zachary S Buckheit for Margaret R. Westbrook. [1001442465] [23-1944] Zachary Buckheit [Entered: 09/20/2023 10:53 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew T. Houston for Margaret R. Westbrook. [1001442457] [23-1944] Matthew Houston [Entered: 09/20/2023 10:48 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001436762] Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/23/2023. Response Brief due 11/20/2023. Mailed to: Kristen Lee, Byron Saintsing, Margaret Westbrook. [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 09/11/2023 02:55 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:19-mc-00028-D. Mailed to: Kristen Lee, Byron Saintsing, Margaret Westbrook. [1001436759] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 09/11/2023 02:52 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-mc-00028-D. Case manager: JeffNeal. [1001436757] [23-1944] JSN [Entered: 09/11/2023 02:50 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less