This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/15/2023 at 06:01:09 (UTC).

Henry v. Howard L. Nations

Case Summary

On 07/17/2023 Henry filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Howard L Nations. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-30467

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Brandon Henry

Daniel Blanchard

Keith Bonvillain

Dwayne Deroche

Christine Duplantis

Defendant / Appellants

Howard L. Nations, A Professional Corporation

Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, A.P.L.C.

Howard L. Nations

Cindy L. Nations

Gregory D. Rueb

Joseph A. Motta

Rueb Law Firm, A Professional Law Corporation

Rueb & Motta, A.P.L.C.

Maxum Indemnity Company

QBE Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jerald P. Block

Matthew F. Block

Matthew Paul Hymel

Sarah Marie Lambert

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Judy Lynn Burnthorn Esq.

Jasmine H. Englert

Seth Andrew Schmeeckle Esq.

Heather Nicole Sharp

Robert I. Siegel

 

Court Documents

74 #2

BR-9 Letter

74 #1

Unfiled Document

#71

(#71) LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: updated caption [23-30467, 23-30470] (MAS) [Entered: 08/31/2023 12:53 PM]

#70

(#70) CLERK ORDER granting Motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellees Mr. Brandon Henry, Mr. Daniel Blanchard, Mr. Keith Bonvillain, Mr. Dwayne Deroche and Ms. Christine Duplantis [ # 68 ] in 23-30467; to extend time to file brief as appellant until 10/03/2023 [70] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/03/2023 for Appellants Howard L. Nations, A Professional Corporation, Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, A.P.L.C., Joseph A. Motta, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, A.P.L.C. and Rueb Law Firm, A.P.L.C. [23-30467, 23-30470] (MAS) [Entered: 08/31/2023 11:19 AM]

#68

(#68) UNOPPOSED MOTION to consolidate cases 23-30467 and 23-30470 for briefing and oral argument purposes. Date of service: 08/30/2023 [23-30467] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Daniel Blanchard, Mr. Keith Bonvillain, Mr. Dwayne Deroche, Ms. Christine Duplantis and Mr. Brandon Henry to consolidate cases Brandon Henry, et al v. Howard L. Nations, APC, et al (Case No. 23-30467) AND Deborah A. Gaudet, et al v. Howard L. Nations, APC, et al (Case No. 23-30470) for briefing and oral argument purposes. Date of service: 08/30/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Block, Block, Hymel, Lambert; Attorney for Appellants: Burnthorn, Englert, Schmeeckle, Sharp, Siegel [23-30467] (Jerald P. Block ) [Entered: 08/30/2023 03:15 PM]

#67

(#67) TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [23-30467] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant QBE Insurance Corporation advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/24/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Block, Block, Hymel, Lambert; Attorney for Appellants: Burnthorn, Englert, Schmeeckle, Sharp, Siegel [23-30467] (Robert I. Siegel ) [Entered: 08/24/2023 01:41 PM]

#66

(#66) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/03/2023 for Appellants Howard L. Nations, A Professional Corporation, Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, A.P.L.C., Maxum Indemnity Company, Joseph A. Motta, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, QBE Insurance Corporation, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, A.P.L.C. and Rueb Law Firm, A Professional Law Corporation. [23-30467] (DDL) [Entered: 08/24/2023 11:13 AM]

#53

No Description Available

#52

No Description Available

#51

No Description Available

#50

No Description Available

#49

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#46

No Description Available

#45

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#74) DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion to withdraw because a motion is not required the attorney is changing law firms but will remain counsel in the case [23-30467, 23-30470] (MAS) [Entered: 09/08/2023 01:51 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#71) LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: updated caption [23-30467, 23-30470] (MAS) [Entered: 08/31/2023 12:53 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#70) CLERK ORDER granting Motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellees Mr. Brandon Henry, Mr. Daniel Blanchard, Mr. Keith Bonvillain, Mr. Dwayne Deroche and Ms. Christine Duplantis [ # 68 ] in 23-30467; to extend time to file brief as appellant until 10/03/2023 [70] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/03/2023 for Appellants Howard L. Nations, A Professional Corporation, Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, A.P.L.C., Joseph A. Motta, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, A.P.L.C. and Rueb Law Firm, A.P.L.C. [23-30467, 23-30470] (MAS) [Entered: 08/31/2023 11:19 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#68) UNOPPOSED MOTION to consolidate cases 23-30467 and 23-30470 for briefing and oral argument purposes. Date of service: 08/30/2023 [23-30467] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Daniel Blanchard, Mr. Keith Bonvillain, Mr. Dwayne Deroche, Ms. Christine Duplantis and Mr. Brandon Henry to consolidate cases Brandon Henry, et al v. Howard L. Nations, APC, et al (Case No. 23-30467) AND Deborah A. Gaudet, et al v. Howard L. Nations, APC, et al (Case No. 23-30470) for briefing and oral argument purposes. Date of service: 08/30/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Block, Block, Hymel, Lambert; Attorney for Appellants: Burnthorn, Englert, Schmeeckle, Sharp, Siegel [23-30467] (Jerald P. Block ) [Entered: 08/30/2023 03:15 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#67) TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [23-30467] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant QBE Insurance Corporation advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/24/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Block, Block, Hymel, Lambert; Attorney for Appellants: Burnthorn, Englert, Schmeeckle, Sharp, Siegel [23-30467] (Robert I. Siegel ) [Entered: 08/24/2023 01:41 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#66) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/03/2023 for Appellants Howard L. Nations, A Professional Corporation, Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, A.P.L.C., Maxum Indemnity Company, Joseph A. Motta, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, QBE Insurance Corporation, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, A.P.L.C. and Rueb Law Firm, A Professional Law Corporation. [23-30467] (DDL) [Entered: 08/24/2023 11:13 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

Docket(#65) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [23-30467] (DDL) [Entered: 08/24/2023 11:12 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

Docket(#64) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:20-CV-2995, 2:20-CV-2997, 2:20-CV-2998. Electronic ROA due on 09/05/2023. [23-30467] (CAG) [Entered: 08/21/2023 01:57 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

Docket(#61) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Heather Nicole Sharp for Appellant Maxum Indemnity Company in 23-30467 [23-30467] (PAC) [Entered: 07/31/2023 09:57 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

Docket(#60) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Heather Nicole Sharp for party(s) Appellant Maxum Indemnity Company, in case 23-30467 [23-30467] (PAC) [Entered: 07/31/2023 09:55 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [28] NOA filed by Appellant QBE Insurance Corporation. [28] [23-30467] (AGL) [Entered: 07/19/2023 08:09 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [25] NOA filed by Appellant QBE Insurance Corporation. [25] [23-30467] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/18/2023 10:20 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [22] Parties added: Appellant QBE Insurance Corporation. NOA filed by Appellant QBE Insurance Corporation. [22] [23-30467] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/18/2023 10:15 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [19] NOA filed by Appellant Maxum Indemnity Company. [19] [23-30467] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/18/2023 10:08 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [12] NOA filed by Appellant Maxum Indemnity Company. [12] [23-30467] (MAS) [Entered: 07/17/2023 05:21 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9] Parties added: Appellant Maxum Indemnity Company. NOA filed by Appellant Maxum Indemnity Company. [9] [23-30467] (MAS) [Entered: 07/17/2023 04:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [6] NOA filed by Appellants Howard L. Nations, A Professional Corporation, Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, A.P.L.C., Mr. Joseph A. Motta, Ms. Cindy L. Nations, Mr. Howard L. Nations, Mr. Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, A.P.L.C. and Rueb Law Firm, A Professional Law Corporation. [6] [23-30467] (MAS) [Entered: 07/17/2023 02:31 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [3] NOA filed by Appellants Howard L. Nations, A Professional Corporation, Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, A.P.L.C., Mr. Joseph A. Motta, Ms. Cindy L. Nations, Mr. Howard L. Nations, Mr. Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, A.P.L.C. and Rueb Law Firm, A Professional Law Corporation. [3] [23-30467] (SEP) [Entered: 07/17/2023 10:13 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

Docket(#2) PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [23-30467] (SEP) [Entered: 07/17/2023 09:58 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Howard L. Nations, A Professional Corporation, Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, A.P.L.C., Mr. Joseph A. Motta, Ms. Cindy L. Nations, Mr. Howard L. Nations, Mr. Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, A.P.L.C. and Rueb Law Firm, A Professional Law Corporation. [23-30467] (SEP) [Entered: 07/17/2023 09:57 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less