This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/26/2023 at 07:34:36 (UTC).

Centripetal Networks, LLC v. Palo Alto Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2023 Centripetal Networks, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Palo Alto Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-2027

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

CENTRIPETAL NETWORKS, LLC

Appellees

PALO ALTO NETWORKS, INC.

CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.

KEYSIGHT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

James R. Hannah Esq.

Appellee Attorneys

Scott Anthony McKeown

Theodore M. Foster

Gerard M. Donovan

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/08/2023. [930371] Docketing Statement is due on 06/29/2023. Certified List is due on 07/25/2023. Entry of Appearance is due on 06/29/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/29/2023. [CMH] [Entered: 06/15/2023 02:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less