This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/30/2023 at 05:16:53 (UTC).

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. v. Lynk Labs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2023 Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd filed an Other lawsuit against Lynk Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-2088

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

Appellee

LYNK LABS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Joseph Palys

Appellee Attorneys

James Carmichael

Stephen McBride

Stephen Terry Schreiner

Minghui Yang

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Entry of Appearance for James T. Carmichael; Stephen T. Schreiner; Stephen P. McBride; Minghui Yang as counsel for Appellee Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2023 by email. [932914] [23-2088] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/28/2023 02:34 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2023 by email. [932919] [23-2088] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/28/2023 02:38 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2023 by email. [932923] [23-2088] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/28/2023 02:41 PM]

#5

(#5) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellee Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2023 by email. [932925] [23-2088] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/28/2023 02:43 PM]

 

Docket Entries

06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellee Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2023 by email. [932925] [23-2088] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/28/2023 02:43 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2023 by email. [932923] [23-2088] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/28/2023 02:41 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2023 by email. [932919] [23-2088] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/28/2023 02:38 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Entry of Appearance for James T. Carmichael; Stephen T. Schreiner; Stephen P. McBride; Minghui Yang as counsel for Appellee Lynk Labs, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2023 by email. [932914] [23-2088] [James Carmichael] [Entered: 06/28/2023 02:34 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/21/2023. [932866] Entry of Appearance due 07/12/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/12/2023. Docketing Statement due 07/12/2023. Certified List due on 08/07/2023. [KMH] [Entered: 06/28/2023 12:01 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less