This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/16/2023 at 06:07:51 (UTC).

Dali Wireless Inc. v. Corning Optical Communications LLC

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 Dali Wireless Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Corning Optical Communications LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1610

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant

CORNING OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

DALI WIRELESS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. Newton Esq.

Caleb Bean

Kirk T. Bradley Esq.

Christopher Timothy Lawn Douglas

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Cristofer Leffler

David Douglas Schumann Esq.

Stefan Szpajda

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Entry of Appearance for Michael J. Newton; Kirk T. Bradley; Christopher Douglas; Caleb J. Bean as counsel for Appellee Corning Optical Communications LLC. Service: 03/28/2023 by email. [912768] [23-1610] [Michael Newton] [Entered: 03/28/2023 06:37 PM]

#3

(#3) Letter from Appellee Corning Optical Communications LLC 2023-1610 Dali Wireless Inc. v. Corning Optical Communications LLC. Service: 03/28/2023 by email. [912770] [23-1610] [Michael Newton] [Entered: 03/28/2023 06:40 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of Appearance for Cristofer Leffler; David Schumann; Stefan Szpajda as counsel for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. [913794] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 03/31/2023 04:22 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. [913795] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 03/31/2023 04:24 PM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. [913796] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 03/31/2023 04:25 PM]

#7

(#7) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. [913797] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 03/31/2023 04:25 PM]

8 #1

Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief

8 #2

Schumann Declaration In Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening

#10

(#10) ORDER modifying the official caption. The revised official caption is reflected in the order; The appendix is due no later than 7 days after the filing of appellant's brief. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [920278] [LMS] [Entered: 05/01/2023 03:05 PM]

 

Docket Entries

05/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER modifying the official caption. The revised official caption is reflected in the order; The appendix is due no later than 7 days after the filing of appellant's brief. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [920278] [LMS] [Entered: 05/01/2023 03:05 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 8 ] filed by Appellant Dali Wireless Inc. The opening brief is due 07/14/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [919013] [CMH] [Entered: 04/25/2023 02:53 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellant Dali Wireless Inc. to extend the time to 07/14/2023 to file brief. Service: 04/20/2023 by email. [918069] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 04/20/2023 05:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. [913797] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 03/31/2023 04:25 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. [913796] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 03/31/2023 04:25 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. [913795] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 03/31/2023 04:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Entry of Appearance for Cristofer Leffler; David Schumann; Stefan Szpajda as counsel for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. [913794] [23-1610] [David Schumann] [Entered: 03/31/2023 04:22 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Letter from Appellee Corning Optical Communications LLC 2023-1610 Dali Wireless Inc. v. Corning Optical Communications LLC. Service: 03/28/2023 by email. [912770] [23-1610] [Michael Newton] [Entered: 03/28/2023 06:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Entry of Appearance for Michael J. Newton; Kirk T. Bradley; Christopher Douglas; Caleb J. Bean as counsel for Appellee Corning Optical Communications LLC. Service: 03/28/2023 by email. [912768] [23-1610] [Michael Newton] [Entered: 03/28/2023 06:37 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/09/2023. [910773] Entry of Appearance is due on 03/31/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/31/2023. Docketing Statement is due on 03/31/2023. Appellant's brief is due on 05/16/2023. [CMH] [Entered: 03/17/2023 04:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less