This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/19/2023 at 06:11:24 (UTC).

In re Bystolic Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 In re Bystolic Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-410

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellants

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Rite Aid Corporation

Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.

Albertsons Companies, Inc.

H-E-B L.P.

The Kroger Co.

Walgreen Co.

J M Smith Corporation, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, DBA Smith Drug Company

KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated also known as Kinney Drugs, Inc

Mayor and City Council of Baltimore

UFCW local 1500 Welfare Fund

Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan

Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund

Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.

Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Beneefit Plan

Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund and Teamsters Local 237 Retirees Benefit Fund

Defendant / Appellees

Forest Laboratories Inc.

Forest Laboratories Ireland, LTD

Forest Laboratories Holdings Ltd.

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Christopher Holding Esq.

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Barry L. Refsin Esq.

Anna Theresa Neill Esq.

Scott Eliot Perwin Esq.

Lauren Carol Ravkind Esq.

Deborah Elman Esq.

Bruce E. Gerstein Esq.

Kimberly Hennings Esq.

David Francis Sorensen Esq.

Robin A. Van der Meulen Esq.

Gregory S. Asciolla Esq.

Matthew Perez Esq.

Sharon K. Robertson Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Eric Grannon

Other Attorneys

John M. Gidley

Jay P. Lefkowitz

David Andrew Hatchett Esq.

Jonathan D. Janow Esq.

Eileen Marie Cole Esq.

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#101

(#101) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund and Teamsters Local 237 Retirees Benefit Fund, Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Beneefit Plan, Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan and UFCW local 1500 Welfare Fund, FILED. Service date 05/09/2023 by CM/ECF.[3512779] [23-410] [Entered: 05/09/2023 03:14 PM]

#98

(#98) NOTICE, to Appellee Amerigen Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Amerigen Pharmaceuticals Ltd. in 23-410, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3512017] [23-410, 23-418, 23-420, 23-423] [Entered: 05/08/2023 03:15 PM]

#97

(#97) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' briefs due date as 06/12/2023, appellees' briefs due date as 07/17/2023,TRANSMITTED.[3511960] [23-410, 23-418, 23-420, 23-423] [Entered: 05/08/2023 02:32 PM]

#95

(#95) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3511942] [23-410, 23-418, 23-420, 23-423] [Entered: 05/08/2023 02:23 PM]

#92

(#92) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B L.P., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co. Motion for admission pro hac vice [42] from the docket, FILED.[3509757] [23-418] [Entered: 05/03/2023 04:27 PM]

#89

(#89) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B L.P., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED. Service date 04/28/2023 by CM/ECF. [3507060] [23-410] [Entered: 04/28/2023 01:30 PM]

#88

(#88) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B L.P., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED. Service date 04/28/2023 by CM/ECF. [3507038] [23-410] [Entered: 04/28/2023 01:12 PM]

11 #2

Case FILED

9 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

9 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

8 #2

Case FILED

8 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/21/2023, RECEIVED.[3489369] [23-410] [Entered: 03/24/2023 04:27 PM]

#2

(#2) SEALED DISTRICT COURT ORDER AND OPINION, dated 02/21/2023, RECEIVED.[3489366] [23-410] [Entered: 03/24/2023 04:26 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#101) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund and Teamsters Local 237 Retirees Benefit Fund, Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Beneefit Plan, Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan and UFCW local 1500 Welfare Fund, FILED. Service date 05/09/2023 by CM/ECF.[3512779] [23-410] [Entered: 05/09/2023 03:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#98) NOTICE, to Appellee Amerigen Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Amerigen Pharmaceuticals Ltd. in 23-410, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3512017] [23-410, 23-418, 23-420, 23-423] [Entered: 05/08/2023 03:15 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#97) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' briefs due date as 06/12/2023, appellees' briefs due date as 07/17/2023,TRANSMITTED.[3511960] [23-410, 23-418, 23-420, 23-423] [Entered: 05/08/2023 02:32 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#95) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3511942] [23-410, 23-418, 23-420, 23-423] [Entered: 05/08/2023 02:23 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#92) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B L.P., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co. Motion for admission pro hac vice [42] from the docket, FILED.[3509757] [23-418] [Entered: 05/03/2023 04:27 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#91) ATTORNEY, Anna Theresa Neill for The Kroger Co. Albertsons Companies, Inc. Walgreen Co. H-E-B L.P., in case 23-410 , [ # 89 ], ADDED.[3509186] [23-410] [Entered: 05/03/2023 09:28 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#90) ATTORNEY, Lauren Carol Ravkind for The Kroger Co. Albertsons Companies, Inc. Walgreen Co. H-E-B L.P., in case 23-410 , [ # 88 ], ADDED.[3509180] [23-410] [Entered: 05/03/2023 09:23 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#89) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B L.P., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED. Service date 04/28/2023 by CM/ECF. [3507060] [23-410] [Entered: 04/28/2023 01:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#88) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B L.P., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED. Service date 04/28/2023 by CM/ECF. [3507038] [23-410] [Entered: 04/28/2023 01:12 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

Docket(#83) ATTORNEY, Bruce E. Gerstein for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. J M Smith Corporation, in case 23-410 and 23-423, [ # 82 ], ADDED.[3505490] [23-423, 23-410] [Entered: 04/26/2023 12:09 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant J M Smith Corporation and KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., FILED. [3489735] [23-423] [Entered: 03/27/2023 11:29 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3489544] [23-420] [Entered: 03/27/2023 09:22 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Teamsters Local 237Welfare Fund and Teamsters Local 237 Retirees Benefit Fund, Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Beneefit Plan, Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan and UFCW local 1500 Welfare Fund, FILED. [3489526] [23-420] [Entered: 03/27/2023 09:15 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3489449] [23-418] [Entered: 03/24/2023 07:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B L.P., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co. in 23-418, FILED. [3489434] [23-418, 23-410] [Entered: 03/24/2023 07:08 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., district court receipt # BNYSDC27491656, FILED.[3489379] [23-410] [Entered: 03/24/2023 04:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3489372] [23-410] [Entered: 03/24/2023 04:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/21/2023, RECEIVED.[3489369] [23-410] [Entered: 03/24/2023 04:27 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SEALED DISTRICT COURT ORDER AND OPINION, dated 02/21/2023, RECEIVED.[3489366] [23-410] [Entered: 03/24/2023 04:26 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., FILED. [3489342] [23-410] [Entered: 03/24/2023 04:01 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less