This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/02/2023 at 05:17:25 (UTC).

Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Ltd. v. Netflix, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 Avago Technologies International Sales Pte Ltd filed an Other lawsuit against Netflix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1815

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LIMITED

Appellee

NETFLIX, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Dan Young

Appellee Attorney

Harper Batts

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/18/2023. [919736] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/12/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/12/2023. Docketing Statement is due on 05/12/2023. Certified List is due on 06/07/2023. [CAB] [Entered: 04/28/2023 09:56 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less