This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/19/2023 at 18:49:59 (UTC).

Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas

Case Summary

On 07/14/2023 Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-3130

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant

BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION

Not Yet Classified

ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF KANSAS, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

ALLIED WORLD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FKA Darwin National Assurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Cameron Ginder

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Justine M. Casey

Brent N. Coverdale

R. Randal Crispen

James David Griffin

Jared K. LeBeau

Todd E. Lundell

Barry L. Pickens

M. Patrick Yingling

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Michael Harper

Joseph Hagedorn Lang

John L. Mullen

Heidi Hudson Raschke

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

[11016901] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 07/27/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130] MPY [Entered: 07/27/2023 05:31 PM]

Open Document

[11016963] Notice received from Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email [23-3130] BLP [Entered: 07/28/2023 09:13 AM]

Open Document

[11016968] Entry of appearance filed by M. Patrick Yingling and Mr. Barry L. Pickens for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (Some of the parties listed are or were counsel of record). Served on 07/27/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130] [Entered: 07/28/2023 09:23 AM]

Open Document

[11016983] Docketing statement filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130] MPY [Entered: 07/28/2023 10:15 AM]

Open Document

[11017021] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130] JHL [Entered: 07/28/2023 11:17 AM]

Open Document

[11017051] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Heidi Hudson Raschke and Joseph Hagedorn Lang for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company . CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email --[Edited 07/28/2023 by MLB to correct docket text][23-3130] [Entered: 07/28/2023 11:55 AM]

Open Document

[11017089] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Michael Harper and John L Mullen for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email --[Edited 08/01/2023 by MLB to correct party filer][23-3130] [Entered: 07/28/2023 01:49 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Notice ROA Complete

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

[11018399] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 09/20/2023 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. [23-3130] [Entered: 08/03/2023 10:59 AM]

Open Document

[11029065] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's opening brief and appendix to 10/11/2023 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. [23-3130] [Entered: 09/15/2023 01:47 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11029065] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's opening brief and appendix to 10/11/2023 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. [23-3130] [Entered: 09/15/2023 01:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11018399] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 09/20/2023 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. [23-3130] [Entered: 08/03/2023 10:59 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11017450] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. ZoomGov conference scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [23-3130] [Entered: 07/31/2023 03:15 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11017220] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/28/2023. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/06/2023 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. [23-3130] [Entered: 07/31/2023 09:10 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11017089] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Michael Harper and John L Mullen for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email --[Edited 08/01/2023 by MLB to correct party filer][23-3130] [Entered: 07/28/2023 01:49 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

Docket[11017067] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher M. Harper and John L. Mullen for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/28/2023 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 07/28/23; corrected party filer][23-3130] CMH [Entered: 07/28/2023 12:51 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11017051] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Heidi Hudson Raschke and Joseph Hagedorn Lang for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company . CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email --[Edited 07/28/2023 by MLB to correct docket text][23-3130] [Entered: 07/28/2023 11:55 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11017021] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130] JHL [Entered: 07/28/2023 11:17 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

Docket[11017015] Entry of appearance submitted by Joseph H. Lang, Jr for Appellee Allied World Specialty Insurance Company for Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Appellee for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/28/2023 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 07/28/23][23-3130] JHL [Entered: 07/28/2023 11:09 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11016983] Docketing statement filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. Served on 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130] MPY [Entered: 07/28/2023 10:15 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

Docket[11016972] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/04/2023 for Skyler O'Hara, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [23-3130] [Entered: 07/28/2023 09:29 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11016968] Entry of appearance filed by M. Patrick Yingling and Mr. Barry L. Pickens for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (Some of the parties listed are or were counsel of record). Served on 07/27/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130] [Entered: 07/28/2023 09:23 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11016963] Notice received from Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/28/2023. Manner of Service: email [23-3130] BLP [Entered: 07/28/2023 09:13 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11016901] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 07/27/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130] MPY [Entered: 07/27/2023 05:31 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

Docket[11016900] Entry of appearance submitted by M. Patrick Yingling; Barry L. Pickens for Appellant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/27/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3130]--[Edited 07/28/2023 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on7/28/2023.] MPY [Entered: 07/27/2023 05:29 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket[11013427] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/14/2023. Docketing statement and transcript order form due 07/28/2023 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 07/28/2023 for Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. Disclosure statement due on 07/28/2023 for Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. [23-3130] [Entered: 07/14/2023 09:35 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less