This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/24/2023 at 06:09:03 (UTC).

Painters & Allied Trades District Council 82 Healt, et al v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2023 Painters Allied Trades District Council 82 Healt, filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-55742

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

PAINTERS & ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 82 HEALTH CARE FUND, third-party healthcare payor fund

ANNIE M. SNYDER, a California consumer

RICKEY D. ROSE, a Missouri consumer

JOHN CARDARELLI, a New Jersey consumer

MARLYON K. BUCKNER, a Florida consumer, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

SYLVIE BIGORD, a Massachusetts consumer

Defendant / Appellants

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, a Japanese Corporation

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U S A INC, an Illinois corporation formerly known as Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc

ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, an Indiana corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Monique Amanda Alarcon Esquire

Michael Baum Esquire

Christopher L. Coffin

Pedram Esfandiary Esquire

R. Brent Wisner

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Darryl Anderson

Jonathan S. Franklin

Michael X. Imbroscio

Peter Bert Siegal Esquire

Andrew James Soukup

Geraldine Young

John C. O'Quinn

Susan E. Burnett

Randall L. Christian

Ryan Moorman

Jason M. Wilcox

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

2 #3

Mediation Letter

2 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

2 #5

Case Opening Packet

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/01/2023. [12785355] [23-55742] (Soukup, Andrew) [Entered: 09/01/2023 12:16 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Eli Lilly and Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/01/2023. [12785834] [23-55742] (Wilcox, Jason) [Entered: 09/01/2023 07:43 PM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/12/2023, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12786554] (VS) [Entered: 09/05/2023 01:56 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 10/16/2023, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12795985] (VS) [Entered: 09/20/2023 02:45 PM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12810015] (VS) [Entered: 10/16/2023 10:38 AM]

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12810015] (VS) [Entered: 10/16/2023 10:38 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 10/16/2023, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12795985] (VS) [Entered: 09/20/2023 02:45 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/12/2023, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12786554] (VS) [Entered: 09/05/2023 01:56 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Eli Lilly and Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/01/2023. [12785834] [23-55742] (Wilcox, Jason) [Entered: 09/01/2023 07:43 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/01/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12785385]. [23-55742] (AD) [Entered: 09/01/2023 12:44 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/01/2023. [12785355] [23-55742] (Soukup, Andrew) [Entered: 09/01/2023 12:16 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

Docket(#4) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 08/25/2023. [12781548] (RT) [Entered: 08/28/2023 09:42 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

Docket(#3) Terminated Robert B. Ellis for Eli Lilly and Company in 23-55742 (not registered) [12781040] (TYL) [Entered: 08/25/2023 12:58 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/01/2023. Transcript ordered by 09/25/2023. Transcript due 10/23/2023. Appellants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc opening brief due 12/04/2023. Appellees Sylvie Bigord, Marlyon K. Buckner, John Cardarelli, Painters & Allied Trades District Council 82 Health Care Fund, Rickey D. Rose and Annie M. Snyder answering brief due 01/04/2024. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12780959] (RT) [Entered: 08/25/2023 11:56 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

Docket(#1) Filed order (MARY M. SCHROEDER and JOHN B. OWENS, Circuit Judges) in case number 23-80051 on August 23, 2023: The motions for leave to file briefs as amicus curiae in support of the petition (Docket Entry Nos. 2, 4) are granted. The Clerk will file the proposed amicus curiae briefs submitted at Docket Entry Nos. 2-2 and 4-2). The motion to file the unredacted answer under seal (Docket Entry No. 7) is granted. See 9th Cir. R. 27-13. The Clerk will file publicly the motion to seal (Docket Entry No. 7-1). The Clerk will file under seal the unredacted answer (Docket Entry No. 7-2). The motion for leave to file a reply (Docket Entry No. 8) is granted. The reply has been filed. The petition for permission to appeal is granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952, 959-60 (9th Cir. 2005) (describing factors this court considers in analyzing a Rule 23(f) petition). Within 14 days, petitioner must comply with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d)(1). [12780954] (RT) [Entered: 08/25/2023 11:53 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less