This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/02/2023 at 06:15:23 (UTC).

Barry v. Depuy Synthes Companies

Case Summary

On 08/03/2023 Barry filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Depuy Synthes Companies. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-2234

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant

DEPUY SYNTHES COMPANIES

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARK A. BARRY

Defendant / Appellees

DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., trading as DePuy Synthes Spine

MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.

DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David Clay Holloway

Courtney Dabbiere

Kathleen Geyer

Dario Alexander Machleidt Esq.

Andrew William Rinehart Esq.

Mitchell G. Stockwell

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Barbara N. Barath

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#8

(#10) ORDER granting the motions [ # 8 ] [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Mark A. Barry; The appeals are consolidated, and thus one set of briefs should be filed for both appeals. The revised official caption is reflected above. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than November 1, 2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [945671] [23-2226, 23-2234] [LMS] [Entered: 08/24/2023 02:13 PM]

#2

(#2) Copy of Memorandum (Document 271) from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. [941335] [ALK] [Entered: 08/08/2023 11:07 AM]

#3

(#3) Docket sheet from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. [942746] [ALK] [Entered: 08/14/2023 12:33 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of Appearance for D. Clay Holloway; Dario A. Machleidt; Courtney S. Dabbiere; Kathleen R. Geyer; Andrew W. Rinehart, Mitchell G. Stockwell as counsel for Appellant Mark A. Barry. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944075] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:22 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Mark A. Barry. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944079] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:24 PM]

#6

(#6) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Mark A. Barry. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944082] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:27 PM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Mark A. Barry. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944084] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:28 PM]

#8

(#8) MOTION of Appellant Mark A. Barry to consolidate appeals (2023-2226). Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944087] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:31 PM]

#9

(#9) MOTION of Appellant Mark A. Barry to extend the time to 11/01/2023 to file brief. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944088] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:34 PM]

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting the motions [ # 8 ] [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Mark A. Barry; The appeals are consolidated, and thus one set of briefs should be filed for both appeals. The revised official caption is reflected above. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than November 1, 2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [945671] [23-2226, 23-2234] [LMS] [Entered: 08/24/2023 02:13 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION of Appellant Mark A. Barry to extend the time to 11/01/2023 to file brief. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944088] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:34 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellant Mark A. Barry to consolidate appeals (2023-2226). Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944087] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:31 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Mark A. Barry. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944084] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Mark A. Barry. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944082] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:27 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Mark A. Barry. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944079] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Entry of Appearance for D. Clay Holloway; Dario A. Machleidt; Courtney S. Dabbiere; Kathleen R. Geyer; Andrew W. Rinehart, Mitchell G. Stockwell as counsel for Appellant Mark A. Barry. Service: 08/17/2023 by clerk. [944075] [23-2234] [David Holloway] [Entered: 08/17/2023 04:22 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Docket sheet from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. [942746] [ALK] [Entered: 08/14/2023 12:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Copy of Memorandum (Document 271) from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. [941335] [ALK] [Entered: 08/08/2023 11:07 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/02/2023. [940403] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/17/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/17/2023. Docketing Statement is due on 08/17/2023. Appellant's brief is due on 10/02/2023. [ALK] [Entered: 08/03/2023 10:25 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less