This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/17/2023 at 06:04:27 (UTC).

Indian Harbor v. Belmont Commons

Case Summary

On 04/18/2023 Indian Harbor filed an Other lawsuit against Belmont Commons. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-30246

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

United Specialty Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

HDI Global Specialty SE

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company

Transverse Specialty Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, severally subscribing to certificate no. AMR-73525

Defendant / Appellants

Belmont Commons, L.L.C., doing business as 925 Common

Belmont Delaware, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Eric Bradley Boettcher

Landon J. Francois

Douglas Russell Holwadel

Raffi Melkonian

Thomas Clark Wright

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Michael D. Lane

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. [23-30246] (SEP) [Entered: 04/18/2023 02:32 PM]

3 #1

Court Order

3 #2

MOT-11 Letter

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael D. Lane for Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-30246] (Michael D. Lane ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:17 PM]

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 04/21/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Boettcher, Francois, Holwadel, Melkonian, Wright; Attorney for Appellant: Lane. [23-30246] (Michael D. Lane ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:19 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Thomas Clark Wright for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-30246] (Thomas Clark Wright ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:29 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Raffi Melkonian for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30246] (Raffi Melkonian ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:31 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Eric Bradley Boettcher for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30246] (Eric Bradley Boettcher ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:32 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Landon J. Francois for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30246] (Landon J. Francois ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:33 PM]

#26

(#26) COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Karen A Ibos. [23-30246] (Karen Anderson Ibos ) [Entered: 05/01/2023 03:35 PM]

#28

(#28) NOTICE RECEIVED from Karen A Ibos that the transcript ordered by Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [23-30246] (Karen Anderson Ibos ) [Entered: 05/05/2023 02:56 PM]

#32

(#32) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/20/2023 for Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C.. [23-30246] (DDL) [Entered: 05/10/2023 08:52 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/20/2023 for Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C.. [23-30246] (DDL) [Entered: 05/10/2023 08:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • Docket(#31) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [23-30246] (DDL) [Entered: 05/10/2023 08:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • Docket(#30) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:22-CV-3874 and 2:22-CV-3876. Electronic ROA due on 05/22/2023. [23-30246] (PAC) [Entered: 05/05/2023 03:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • Docket(#29) TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Karen Anderson Ibos, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 05/05/2023 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [23-30246] (PAC) [Entered: 05/05/2023 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE RECEIVED from Karen A Ibos that the transcript ordered by Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [23-30246] (Karen Anderson Ibos ) [Entered: 05/05/2023 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Docket(#27) ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Karen Anderson Ibos, Est. Completion Dt: 06/01/2023, Est. No.of Pgs: 20, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 05/01/2023, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 06/01/2023, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 12/21/2022. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 06/01/2023 for Karen Anderson Ibos, Court Reporter [23-30246] (MAS) [Entered: 05/03/2023 02:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Karen A Ibos. [23-30246] (Karen Anderson Ibos ) [Entered: 05/01/2023 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#23) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael D. Lane for Appellant Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. in 23-30246, Attorney Michael D. Lane for Appellant Belmont Commons, L.L.C. in 23-30246 [23-30246] (MRW) [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee Transverse Specialty Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee Old Republic Union Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee HDI Global Specialty SE in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee United Specialty Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee Steadfast Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee QBE Specialty Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Landon J. Francois for Appellee Indian Harbor Insurance Company in 23-30246 [23-30246] (MRW) [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#19) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee Transverse Specialty Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee Old Republic Union Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee HDI Global Specialty SE in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee United Specialty Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee Steadfast Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee QBE Specialty Insurance Company in 23-30246, Attorney Eric Bradley Boettcher for Appellee Indian Harbor Insurance Company in 23-30246 [23-30246] (MRW) [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Landon J. Francois for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30246] (Landon J. Francois ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Eric Bradley Boettcher for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30246] (Eric Bradley Boettcher ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Raffi Melkonian for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30246] (Raffi Melkonian ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Thomas Clark Wright for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-30246] (Thomas Clark Wright ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 04/21/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Boettcher, Francois, Holwadel, Melkonian, Wright; Attorney for Appellant: Lane. [23-30246] (Michael D. Lane ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael D. Lane for Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-30246] (Michael D. Lane ) [Entered: 04/21/2023 03:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Docket(#8) FEE PAID by Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C.. Fee deadline satisfied [23-30246] (MAS) [Entered: 04/21/2023 12:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • Docket(#5) JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW COMPLETE. [23-30246] (SEP) [Entered: 04/18/2023 02:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PERMISSION TO APPEAL GRANTED. Case transferred from miscellaneous case number 23-90011. Fee due on 05/02/2023 for Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. Transcript order due on 05/03/2023 for Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. [23-30246] (SEP) [Entered: 04/18/2023 02:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Belmont Commons, L.L.C. and Belmont Delaware, L.L.C. [23-30246] (SEP) [Entered: 04/18/2023 02:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less