This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 06:03:03 (UTC).

Casa De Maryland, Inc. v. Chad Wolf

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Casa De Maryland, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Chad Wolf. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2263

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

PANGEA LEGAL SERVICES

CASA DE MARYLAND, INCORPORATED, on behalf of itself and its members

ASYLUM SEEKER ADVOCACY PROJECT, INC., on behalf of itself and its members

CENTRO LEGAL DE LA RAZA

OASIS LEGAL SERVICES

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

CHAD F. WOLF, in his official capacity as the purported Acting Secretary of Homeland Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dennise Moreno

Attorney at ASYLUM SEEKER ADVOCACY PROJECT

228 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10003

Linda B. Evarts

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

1 Battery Park Plaza

New York City, NY 10004

Katie Marquart

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0000

Joseph Evall

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0000

Richard W. Mark

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0000

Geroline A. Castillo

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

1 Battery Park Plaza

New York City, NY 10004

Mariko Hirose

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

1 Battery Park Plaza

New York City, NY 10004

Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

1 Battery Park Plaza

New York City, NY 10004

Conchita Cruz

Attorney at ASYLUM SEEKER ADVOCACY PROJECT

228 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10003

Justin Bryan Cox

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

P. O. Box 170208

Atlanta, GA 30317

Zachary Manfredi

Attorney at ASYLUM SEEKER ADVOCACY PROJECT

228 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10003

Zachary-John Alexander Manfredi

Attorney at ASYLUM SEEKER ADVOCACY PROJECT

228 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10003-1502

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jane Elizabeth Andersen

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

36 South Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 10 ]. Number of days granted: 60. Opening brief and appendix due 03/22/2021. Opening/Response Brief Due: 04/21/2021. Response/Reply Brief Due 05/21/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000880556] [20-2217, 20-2263] EB [Entered: 01/13/2021 10:25 AM]

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION by United States Department of Homeland Security and Chad F. Wolf in 20-2217, 20-2263 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 03/22/2012.. Date and method of service: 01/12/2021 ecf. [1000880249] [20-2217, 20-2263] Jane Andersen [Entered: 01/12/2021 05:19 PM]

#17

(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/19/2021. Opening/Response Brief Due: 02/18/2021. Response/Reply Brief Due 03/22/2021. [20-2217, 20-2263] EB [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:27 AM]

#16

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zachary-John A. Manfredi for Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services and Casa De Maryland, Incorporated in 20-2217, Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Casa De Maryland, Incorporated, Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services and Pangea Legal Services in 20-2263. [1000862362] [20-2217, 20-2263] Zachary-John Manfredi [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:03 AM]

#15

(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Casa De Maryland, Incorporated, Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services and Pangea Legal Services. [20-2263] Linda Evarts [Entered: 12/09/2020 09:55 AM]

#14

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Geroline A. Castillo for Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Casa De Maryland, Incorporated, Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services and Pangea Legal Services in 20-2217. [1000861788] [20-2217, 20-2263] Geroline Castillo [Entered: 12/08/2020 12:46 PM]

#13

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin B Cox for Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Casa De Maryland, Incorporated, Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services and Pangea Legal Services in 20-2217. [1000855824] [20-2217, 20-2263] Justin Cox [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:38 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jane E. Andersen for United States Department of Homeland Security and Chad F. Wolf in 20-2217, 20-2263. [1000855278] [20-2217, 20-2263] Jane Andersen [Entered: 11/25/2020 07:44 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-2263 with 20-2217(L). Cross-appeal appellant: Chad F. Wolf and U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin; Geroline A. Castillo; Conchita Cruz; Joseph Evall; Zachary Manfredi; Katie Marquart; Dennise Moreno. [1000855023] [20-2217, 20-2263] EB [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:15 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-02118-PX. Mailed to: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin; Geroline A. Castillo; Conchita Cruz; Joseph Evall; Zachary Manfredi; Katie Marquart; Dennise Moreno. [20-2263] EB [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:08 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-02118-PX. Case manager: EBorneisen. [20-2263] EB [Entered: 11/25/2020 11:55 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 10 ]. Number of days granted: 60. Opening brief and appendix due 03/22/2021. Opening/Response Brief Due: 04/21/2021. Response/Reply Brief Due 05/21/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000880556] [20-2217, 20-2263] EB [Entered: 01/13/2021 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION by United States Department of Homeland Security and Chad F. Wolf in 20-2217, 20-2263 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 03/22/2012.. Date and method of service: 01/12/2021 ecf. [1000880249] [20-2217, 20-2263] Jane Andersen [Entered: 01/12/2021 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/19/2021. Opening/Response Brief Due: 02/18/2021. Response/Reply Brief Due 03/22/2021. [20-2217, 20-2263] EB [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zachary-John A. Manfredi for Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services and Casa De Maryland, Incorporated in 20-2217, Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Casa De Maryland, Incorporated, Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services and Pangea Legal Services in 20-2263. [1000862362] [20-2217, 20-2263] Zachary-John Manfredi [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Casa De Maryland, Incorporated, Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services and Pangea Legal Services. [20-2263] Linda Evarts [Entered: 12/09/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Geroline A. Castillo for Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Casa De Maryland, Incorporated, Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services and Pangea Legal Services in 20-2217. [1000861788] [20-2217, 20-2263] Geroline Castillo [Entered: 12/08/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin B Cox for Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Inc., Casa De Maryland, Incorporated, Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services and Pangea Legal Services in 20-2217. [1000855824] [20-2217, 20-2263] Justin Cox [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jane E. Andersen for United States Department of Homeland Security and Chad F. Wolf in 20-2217, 20-2263. [1000855278] [20-2217, 20-2263] Jane Andersen [Entered: 11/25/2020 07:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-2263 with 20-2217(L). Cross-appeal appellant: Chad F. Wolf and U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin; Geroline A. Castillo; Conchita Cruz; Joseph Evall; Zachary Manfredi; Katie Marquart; Dennise Moreno. [1000855023] [20-2217, 20-2263] EB [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-02118-PX. Mailed to: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin; Geroline A. Castillo; Conchita Cruz; Joseph Evall; Zachary Manfredi; Katie Marquart; Dennise Moreno. [20-2263] EB [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:20-cv-02118-PX. Case manager: EBorneisen. [20-2263] EB [Entered: 11/25/2020 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Casa De Maryland, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oasis Legal Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project is a litigant

Latest cases where Pangea Legal Services is a litigant