This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 06:08:29 (UTC).

Carrie Clark v. City of Tucson

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Carrie Clark filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Tucson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16430

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CARRIE FERRARA CLARK

Defendant / Appellee

CITY OF TUCSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey Jacobson

Attorney at Jacobson Law Firm

2730 East Broadway Boulevard, Suite 160

Tucson, AZ 85716

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michelle Rebecca Saavedra

Attorney at City of Tucson Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 27210

Tucson, AZ 85726-7210

Renee Jeanette Waters

Attorney at City of Tucson Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 27210

Tucson, AZ 85726-7210

Robert Alan Bernheim Esquire

Attorney at Farhang & Medcoff, PLLC

4801 E. Broadway Boulevard, Suite 311

Tucson, AZ 85711

Roberto C. Garcia

Attorney at Farhang & Medcoff, PLLC

4801 E. Broadway Boulevard, Suite 311

Tucson, AZ 85711

Ali John Farhang

Attorney at Farhang & Medcoff, PLLC

4801 E. Broadway Boulevard, Suite 311

Tucson, AZ 85711

 

Court Documents

8 #3

Additional Document

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

Main Document

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Tucson reply to response to order to show cause dated 07/30/2020. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808550] [20-16430] (Bernheim, Robert) [Entered: 08/31/2020 05:14 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Carrie Ferrara Clark response to order to show cause dated 08/19/2020. Date of service: 08/19/2020. [11795767] [20-16430] (Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/19/2020 07:36 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/19/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11778031] (VS) [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:25 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Carrie Ferrara Clark Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/03/2020. [11775072] [20-16430] (Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/03/2020 01:05 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): The notice of appeal filed July 24, 2020 challenges orders of the district court entered February 26, 2020 and April 25, 2018. A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over the appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the challenged orders. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11771784] (WL) [Entered: 07/30/2020 10:52 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Tucson Correspondence: Notice of errata Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808605] [20-16430]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 09/01/2020 by TYL] (Bernheim, Robert) [Entered: 08/31/2020 05:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Tucson reply to response to order to show cause dated 07/30/2020. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808550] [20-16430] (Bernheim, Robert) [Entered: 08/31/2020 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Carrie Ferrara Clark response to order to show cause dated 08/19/2020. Date of service: 08/19/2020. [11795767] [20-16430] (Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/19/2020 07:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/19/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11778031] (VS) [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/03/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11775902]. [20-16430] (AD) [Entered: 08/03/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Carrie Ferrara Clark Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/03/2020. [11775072] [20-16430] (Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/03/2020 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): The notice of appeal filed July 24, 2020 challenges orders of the district court entered February 26, 2020 and April 25, 2018. A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over the appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the challenged orders. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11771784] (WL) [Entered: 07/30/2020 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Carrie Ferrara Clark Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/03/2020. Transcript ordered by 08/24/2020. Transcript due 09/22/2020. Appellant Carrie Ferrara Clark opening brief due 11/02/2020. Appellee City of Tucson answering brief due 12/02/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11766777] (RT) [Entered: 07/27/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less