Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2020 at 05:53:01 (UTC).

Carranza-Lopez v. Barr

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Carranza-Lopez filed an Other lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-9583

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUIS ROGELIO CARRANZA-LOPEZ

Phoenix, AZ 85037

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Luis Rogelio Carranza-Lopez

4230 North 92Nd Lane

Phoenix, AZ 85037

Respondent Attorneys

Lansing W. Tyler

Attorney at DHS Immigration and Customs Enforcement

12445 East Caley Avenue, Jim Bailey Building

Centennial, CO 80111

Elizabeth Fitzgerald-Sambou

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

Oil Oil

Attorney at Department of Justice

450 5Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

DOH/EOIR/BIA

Attorney at Attn: Certification Unit

P.O. Box 8530

Falls Church, VA 22041

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #3

Petition for Review Letter

Open Restricted Document #2

Envelope

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10756764] Jurisdiction challenged. Response due on 08/11/2020 for Luis Rogelio Carranza-Lopez. Failure to file a timely response may result in dismissal without further notice. [20-9583] [Entered: 07/21/2020 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10756538] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Elizabeth Fitzgerald-Sambou for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/20/2020. Manner of Service: US Mail.--[Edited 07/20/2020 by LAB to correct method of service.] [20-9583] [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket[10756525] Entry of appearance submitted by Elizabeth K. Fitzgerald-Sambou for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/20/2020. Manner of Service: US mail.--[Edited 07/20/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/20/20.] [20-9583] EF [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10756394] Petition for review filed. Served on 07/15/2020. Manner of Service: US mail - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, General Counsel, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 07/20/2020 letter. Fee pd:Check #: money order, Receipt #: TBD, Amount: $ $500. Notice of appearance due on 08/03/2020 for William P. Barr, and Notice of appearance due on 08/19/2020 for Luis Rogelio Carranza-Lopez [20-9583] [Entered: 07/20/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less