This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/30/2022 at 05:44:13 (UTC).

Carolyn Brown, et al v. Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Carolyn Brown filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Property Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15587

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Appellants

CAROLYN BROWN

Madera, CA 93638

MECCA MORGAN

Los Angeles, CA 90016

Counter Claimant

PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Carolyn Brown

26933 Fonda Avenue

Madera, CA 93638

Mecca Morgan

2619 S Victoria Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90016

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew Bennett Downs

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey, PC

101 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

Linda B. Oliver

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey, PC

101 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Additional Document

3 #1

Fee Due OSC

3 #2

Main Document

#3

Additional Document

#4

(#4) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Motion filed by Appellant Carolyn Brown. [12429674] (NAC) [Entered: 04/25/2022 09:20 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (SJS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in that pilot project. By May 11, 2022,the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or in the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (Steven_Saltiel@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Steven Saltiel, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12432643] (RY) [Entered: 04/27/2022 01:58 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (SJS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in that pilot project. By May 11, 2022,the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or in the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (Steven_Saltiel@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Steven Saltiel, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12432643] (RY) [Entered: 04/27/2022 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Motion filed by Appellant Carolyn Brown. [12429674] (NAC) [Entered: 04/25/2022 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12428991] (CKP) [Entered: 04/22/2022 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12428969] (CKP) [Entered: 04/22/2022 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 05/20/2022. Transcript due 06/20/2022. Appellants Carolyn Brown and Mecca Morgan opening brief due 07/29/2022. Appellee Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford answering brief due 08/29/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12428664] (JBS) [Entered: 04/22/2022 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda B Oliver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew B. Downs