Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2021 at 06:07:54 (UTC).

Caroline Connor v. Unum Life Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Caroline Connor filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Unum Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15034

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

HUMBOLDT MEDICAL SPECIALISTS, INC. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN

Plaintiff / Appellee

CAROLINE L. CONNOR, M.D.

Defendant / Appellant

UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Scott E. Calvert

Attorney at Donahue & Horrow

1960 E. Grand Avenue

El Segundo, CA 90245

Michael Horrow

Attorney at Donahue & Horrow

1960 E. Grand Avenue

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel William Maguire Esquire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Karen Tsui

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 05/03/2021, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America opening brief due 05/17/2021. Appellee Caroline L. Connor answering brief due 06/16/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12014443] (CL) [Entered: 02/23/2021 06:48 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/17/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11991392] (CL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:45 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/14/2021. [11963703] [21-15034] (Maguire, Daniel) [Entered: 01/14/2021 11:18 AM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 05/03/2021, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America opening brief due 05/17/2021. Appellee Caroline L. Connor answering brief due 06/16/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12014443] (CL) [Entered: 02/23/2021 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/17/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11991392] (CL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/14/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11963904]. [21-15034] (AD) [Entered: 01/14/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/14/2021. [11963703] [21-15034] (Maguire, Daniel) [Entered: 01/14/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/14/2021. Transcript ordered by 02/05/2021. Transcript due 03/08/2021. Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America opening brief due 04/16/2021. Appellee Caroline L. Connor answering brief due 05/17/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11955505] (JBS) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unum Life Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen T. Tsui

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel W. Maguire