This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2021 at 06:28:15 (UTC).

Carol DePuydt-Meier v. U.S. Bank, NA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Carol DePuydt-Meier filed an Other lawsuit against U S Bank, NA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1001

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

CAROL LEE DEPUYDT-MEIER

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Debtor

In re: CAROL LEE DEPUYDT-MEIER

Appellee

U.S. BANK, NA, as Legal Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Carol Lee DePuydt-Meier

61 Rudgear Drive

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Appellee Attorney

Diane V. Weifenbach

5120 E. La Palma Ave

Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Filed order (TAYLOR); re breifing of appeal. Appellee U.S. Bank, NA's opening brief due 03/31/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:17 AM]

8 #17

Part 17

8 #16

Part 16

8 #15

Part 15

8 #14

Part 14

8 #13

Part 13

8 #12

Part 12

8 #11

Part 11

8 #10

Part 10

8 #9

Part 9

#8

Part 8

8 #7

Part 7

8 #6

Part 6

8 #5

Part 5

8 #4

Part 4

8 #3

Part 3

8 #2

Part 2

8 #1

Table of Contents / Part 1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed order (TAYLOR); re breifing of appeal. Appellee U.S. Bank, NA's opening brief due 03/31/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Received from bankruptcy cpourt Carol Lee DePuydt-Meier's original and copies of Excerpts of Record, filed on 02/25/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Recieved from bankruptcy court copy of appellant's Carol DePuydt-Meier's opening brief. (CLS) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Deficiency sent to Appellant RE: statement of issues not filed, lack of prosecution. Re: Response Due: 02/24/2021. cc: All parties. (CLS) [Entered: 02/10/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of Appellant's copy of Transmission of Document (Incomplete Record on Appeal) on Appeal to Bankruptcy Appellant Panel filed in Bk. Ct. 02/02/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 02/08/2021 07:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of Transmission of Document (Incomplete Record on Appeal) on Appeal to Bankruptcy Appellant Panel filed in Bk. Ct. 02/02/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 02/05/2021 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Deficiency sent to Appellant RE: Fee Due; lack of prosecution. Re: Response Due: 01/26/2021. cc: All parties. (CLS) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Carol Lee DePuydt-Meier. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Carol Lee DePuydt-Meier's opening brief due 02/26/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 01/11/2021, notice of referral, transmittal form,. Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Records Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (CLS) [Entered: 01/12/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant