This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:07:12 (UTC).

Carlos Osorio-Pineda v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Carlos Osorio-Pineda filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70374

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARLOS OSORIO-PINEDA

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christopher John Stender Esquire

Attorney at Federal Immigration Counselors, AZ, PC

141 East Palm Lane

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Counsel Case Information Packet

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #4

Petition For Review and BIA Decision

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595706]. [20-70374] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review. COUNSELED. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Carlos Osorio-Pineda. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11594602] (HC) [Entered: 02/12/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less