This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2019 at 05:07:52 (UTC).

Carlos Landeros v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 a Other case was filed by Carlos Landeros against William Barr in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-72855

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARLOS LANDEROS

Adelanto, CA 92301

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Carlos Landeros

Attorney at ADC - ADELANTO DETENTION CENTER

P.O. Box 6005

Adelanto, CA 92301

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Petition for Review and Emergency Stay of Deportation

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Pro Se Immigration Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed Petitioner Carlos Landeros motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/8/2019. [11496115][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 11/13/2019 by BY] (JPD) [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. NO BIA DECISION. PRO SE. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? YES. Certified Administrative Record due 12/17/2019. Response to motion for stay due 01/07/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 02/18/2020 for Carlos Landeros. Respondent brief due 04/15/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11496112][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 11/13/2019 by BY] (JPD) [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.