This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:08:41 (UTC).

Carlos Alvarez-Palomera v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Carlos Alvarez-Palomera filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70383

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARLOS ALBERTO ALVAREZ-PALOMERA

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Nathan Dane Rivera Esquire

Attorney at Parmenter Rivera LLP

53 S. Shilling, Po Box 700

Blackfoot, ID 83221

David N. Parmenter

Attorney at PARMENTER & ASSOCIATES

53 S. Shilling, P.O. Box 700

Blackfoot, ID 83221

Respondent Attorneys

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Aric Allan Anderson

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #6

BIA Decision

1 #4

Motion for Stay of Removal

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Petition for Review

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #5

Memorandum in Support of Motion for Stay of Removal

1 #7

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Aric Allan Anderson for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, in case 20-70383. [11596381] (QDL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Aric Allan Anderson (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division, Office of Immigration Litigation, P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station, Washington, DC 20044) for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 02/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11596337] [20-70383] (Anderson, Aric) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595714]. [20-70383] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Response to motion for stay due 04/08/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Carlos Alberto Alvarez-Palomera. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11595550] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less