This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2021 at 06:03:12 (UTC).

Carla Jones v. Ann Arbor Public Schools

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Carla Jones filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ann Arbor Public Schools. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1327

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ANN ARBOR PUBLIC SCHOOLS

ANN ARBOR, MI PUBLIC SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION

JEANICE KERR SWIFT

Plaintiff / Appellant

CARLA JONES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert M. Vercruysse

Anne-Marie V. Welch

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Carla Jones

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) DUPLICATE - SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Ms. Carla Jones. Signed Notice of Appeal also received April 26, 2021. (JAC) [Entered: 05/20/2021 03:29 PM]

#15

(#15) Copy of RE #42 motion to expand the record from district court filed May 3, 2021. (JAC) [Entered: 05/06/2021 02:58 PM]

13 #2

IFP Form 4

13 #1

DC Denial With Time

#12

(#12) Copy of District Court Order (RE #41) filed April 23, 2021 denying in forma pauperis. (JAC) [Entered: 04/26/2021 10:02 AM]

#11

(#11) SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Ms. Carla Jones. (JAC) [Entered: 04/26/2021 09:52 AM]

10 #3

document returned unfiled

10 #2

document returned unfiled

10 #1

Letter

9 #2

amended caption

9 #1

Letter

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Robert M. Vercruysse for Ann Arbor Public Schools, Ann Arbor, MI Public Schools Board of Education and Jeanice Kerr Swift regarding Representation and Case Caption. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327] (RMV) [Entered: 04/20/2021 10:00 AM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Ann Arbor Public Schools by Anne-Marie V. Welch. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327] (AVW) [Entered: 04/19/2021 03:07 PM]

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert M. Vercruysse for Appellee Ann Arbor Public Schools. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327]--[Edited 04/19/2021 by JAC to reflect only party listed] (RMV) [Entered: 04/19/2021 03:04 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Ann Arbor Public Schools by Robert M. Vercruysse. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327] (RMV) [Entered: 04/19/2021 02:52 PM]

#3

form(s) sent

3 #2

show cause order filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DUPLICATE - SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Ms. Carla Jones. Signed Notice of Appeal also received April 26, 2021. (JAC) [Entered: 05/20/2021 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Copy of RE #42 motion to expand the record from district court filed May 3, 2021. (JAC) [Entered: 05/06/2021 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docket(#14) Update fee status change to paid. District Court RE #43: Appeal Fee received for RE #38 Notice of Appeal filed by Carla Jones in the amount of $ 505 - Receipt No. DET135326. (JAC) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. (JAC) [Entered: 04/26/2021 10:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Copy of District Court Order (RE #41) filed April 23, 2021 denying in forma pauperis. (JAC) [Entered: 04/26/2021 10:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Ms. Carla Jones. (JAC) [Entered: 04/26/2021 09:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER SENT to Ms. Carla Jones, regarding return of unfiled documents. (JAC) [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER SENT to appellant and counsel regarding amended caption. (JAC) [Entered: 04/20/2021 01:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Robert M. Vercruysse for Ann Arbor Public Schools, Ann Arbor, MI Public Schools Board of Education and Jeanice Kerr Swift regarding Representation and Case Caption. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327] (RMV) [Entered: 04/20/2021 10:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NOTIFICATION (USING THE CM/ECF EVENT "NOTIFICATION" *** FILED: Appellee's Notification of Representation and Court of Appeals Case Caption by Mr. Robert M. Vercruysse for Ann Arbor Public Schools, Ann Arbor, MI Public Schools Board of Education and Jeanice Kerr Swift. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327]--[Edited 04/19/2021 by JAC] (RMV) [Entered: 04/19/2021 04:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Ann Arbor Public Schools by Anne-Marie V. Welch. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327] (AVW) [Entered: 04/19/2021 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert M. Vercruysse for Appellee Ann Arbor Public Schools. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327]--[Edited 04/19/2021 by JAC to reflect only party listed] (RMV) [Entered: 04/19/2021 03:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Ann Arbor Public Schools by Robert M. Vercruysse. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-1327] (RMV) [Entered: 04/19/2021 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SHOW CAUSE order filed: It is ordered that Carla Jones has twenty-one days from the date of this order to comply with Rule 11(a) by signing the enclosed copy of the notice of appeal filed on April 1, 2021, and returning it to this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the appeal. (JAC) [Entered: 04/08/2021 08:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Julie Connor (JAC) [Entered: 04/06/2021 09:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Carla Jones. Transcript needed: n. (JAC) [Entered: 04/06/2021 09:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less