This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 at 06:10:15 (UTC).

Carl Samson v. USA

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Carl Samson filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11048

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

CARL RICHARD SAMSON

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Richard Carroll Klugh Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of Richard C. Klugh

25 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 100

Miami, FL 33131

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard Carroll Klugh, Jr. for Appellant Carl Richard Samson. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11048] (ECF: Richard Klugh) [Entered: 04/06/2019 09:58 AM]

Open Document #1

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document #4

DC Order Doc 36

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Richard Carroll Klugh, Jr. for Appellant Carl Richard Samson. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11048] (ECF: Richard Klugh) [Entered: 04/20/2019 12:12 PM]

Open Document #5

DC R&R Doc 31

Open Document #1

HAB-3 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

The Transcript Order Form has not been filed as to Appellant Carl Richard Samson. The appellant is hereby notified that upon expiration of 14 days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the default has been corrected. [Entered: 04/15/2019 04:37 PM]

Open Document #3

DC Order Doc 33

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [19-11048] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:33 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Emily M. Smachetti for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11048] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:33 AM]

Open Document #1

MOT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for COA

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file motion for COA filed by Appellant Carl Richard Samson is GRANTED. [ # 8751327-2 ] COA due on 05/28/2019. GBT [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability to 05/28/2019 filed by Carl Richard Samson. Motion is Unopposed. [8751327-1] [19-11048] (ECF: Richard Klugh) [Entered: 04/20/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Richard Carroll Klugh, Jr. for Appellant Carl Richard Samson. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11048] (ECF: Richard Klugh) [Entered: 04/20/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The Transcript Order Form has not been filed as to Appellant Carl Richard Samson. The appellant is hereby notified that upon expiration of 14 days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the default has been corrected. [Entered: 04/15/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Carl Richard Samson was filed on 04/10/2019. Docket Entry 41. [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard Carroll Klugh, Jr. for Appellant Carl Richard Samson. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11048] (ECF: Richard Klugh) [Entered: 04/06/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Richard Carroll Klugh, Jr. for Carl Richard Samson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Emily M. Smachetti for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11048] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [19-11048] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Carl Richard Samson on 03/18/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.