Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2019 at 06:04:30 (UTC).

Carl Mitchell, et al v. DTLA Alliance for Human Rights, et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 Carl Mitchell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DTLA Alliance for Human Rights. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56143

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

LOS ANGELES CATHOLIC WORKER

JUDY COLEMAN

SALVADOR ROQUE

MICHAEL ESCOBEDO

CARL MITCHELL

CANGRESS, an organization

Petitioner / Appellants

KARYN PINSKY

JOSEPH BURKE

CHARLES MALOW

HARRY TASHDIJIAN

CHARLES VAN SCOY, Proposed Intervenor Defendants

DTLA ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN RIGHTS

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

RICHTER, Sgt.

ANDREW MATHIS, Lt.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Shayla Renee Myers

Attorney at Legal Aid Foundation of Los Angeles

7000 South Broadway

Los Angeles, CA 90003

Carol A. Sobel

Attorney at Law Office of Carol A. Sobel

725 Arizona Avenue, Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Paul L. Hoffman

Attorney at Schonbrun DeSimone Seplow Harris & Hoffman

723 Ocean Front Walk

Venice, CA 90291

Catherine Sweetser

Attorney at Schonbrun Seplow Harris and Hoffman LLP

11543 W. Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Elizabeth A. Mitchell

Attorney at Spertus, Landes & Umhofer, LLP

617 West 7Th Street, Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jonathan H. Eisenman

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

200 North Main Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11476632] (VS) [Entered: 10/24/2019 01:52 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/21/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11455554] (VS) [Entered: 10/07/2019 08:52 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees Carl Mitchell, Salvador Roque, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Judy Coleman and Cangress Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/04/2019. [11454666] [19-56143] (Sobel, Carol) [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:54 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Joseph Burke, DTLA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdijian and Charles Van Scoy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/04/2019. [11454461] [19-56143] (Mitchell, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:54 AM]

1 #6

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediaiton Questionnaire Instructions

1 #3

Mediaton Questionnaire

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • (#10) Streamlined request [9] by Appellants Joseph Burke, DTLA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdijian and Charles Van Scoy to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for 30 days. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Joseph Burke, DTLA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdijian and Charles Van Scoy opening brief due 12/30/2019. Appellees Cangress, City of Los Angeles, Judy Coleman, Michael Escobedo, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Andrew Mathis, Carl Mitchell, Richter and Salvador Roque answering brief due 01/29/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11511835] (BG) [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Joseph Burke, DTLA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdijian and Charles Van Scoy. New requested due date is 12/26/2019. [11510708] [19-56143] (Mitchell, Elizabeth) [Entered: 11/25/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11476632] (VS) [Entered: 10/24/2019 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/21/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11455554] (VS) [Entered: 10/07/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees Carl Mitchell, Salvador Roque, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Judy Coleman and Cangress Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/04/2019. [11454666] [19-56143] (Sobel, Carol) [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/04/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11454584][19-56143] (AD) [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Joseph Burke, DTLA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdijian and Charles Van Scoy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/04/2019. [11454461] [19-56143] (Mitchell, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#3) Attorneys Felix Lebron substituted by Attorneys Jonathan H Eisenman, [11453679] (JFF) [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of JONATHAN H. EISENMAN (Office of the City Attorney, 200 No. Main Street, 7th City Hall East, Los Angeles, CA 90012) for Appellees City of Los Angeles, Andrew Mathis and Richter. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Felix Lebron, Esquire for Appellees City of Los Angeles, Andrew Mathis and Richter. Date of service: 10/03/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11453634] [19-56143] (Eisenman, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/04/2019. Appellants Joseph Burke, DTLA Alliance for Human Rights, Charles Malow, Karyn Pinsky, Harry Tashdijian and Charles Van Scoy opening brief due 11/29/2019. Appellees Cangress, City of Los Angeles, Judy Coleman, Michael Escobedo, Los Angeles Catholic Worker, Andrew Mathis, Carl Mitchell, Richter and Salvador Roque answering brief due 12/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11446029] (RT) [Entered: 09/27/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less