Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2020 at 06:08:16 (UTC).

Carl Merkle v. David Gragg, et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 Carl Merkle filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against David Gragg. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-50471

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

WILLIAM C. GARLINGTON

KEVIN F. SHEA

JOEL W. REESE

Dallas, TX 75201

BRADLEY M. GORDON

Dallas, TX 75201

DAVID S. GRAGG

San Antonio, TX 78212

DENIS B. STRATFORD

REESE GORDON MARKETOS, L.L.P.

LANGLEY & BANACK, INCORPORATED

NATALIE FRIEND WILSON

San Antonio, TX 78212

CAPITAL CROSSING SERVICING COMPANY, L.L.C.

Plaintiff / Appellant

CARL NATHANIEL MERKLE, also known as Carl Nathan Merkle

San Antonio, TX 78233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David S. Gragg

Attorney at Langley & Banack, Incorporated

745 E. Mulberry Avenue

San Antonio, TX 78212

Natalie Friend Wilson Esq.

Attorney at Langley & Banack, Incorporated

745 E. Mulberry Avenue

San Antonio, TX 78212

Joel Wilson Reese

Attorney at Reese Marketos, L.L.P.

750 N. Saint Paul Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Bradley M. Gordon

Attorney at Reese Marketos, L.L.P.

750 N. Saint Paul Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Carl Nathaniel Merkle

4446 Bayliss Street

San Antonio, TX 78233

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/17/2020 for Appellant Carl Nathaniel Merkle. [20-50471] (DDL) [Entered: 07/07/2020 01:03 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9349293-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50471] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/07/2020 08:37 AM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9344086-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Carl Nathaniel Merkle. [9344086-1] [20-50471] (RSM) [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:34 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Natalie Friend Wilson, Esq. for Capital Crossing Servicing Company, L.L.C., Mr. William C. Garlington, David S. Gragg, Langley & Banack, Incorporated, Mr. Kevin F. Shea, Mr. Denis B. Stratford and Natalie Friend Wilson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50471] (Natalie Friend Wilson ) [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:51 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50471] (Bradley M. Gordon ) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:47 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50471] (Joel Wilson Reese ) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:45 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David S. Gragg for Capital Crossing Servicing Company, L.L.C., Mr. William C. Garlington, David S. Gragg, Langley & Banack, Incorporated, Mr. Kevin F. Shea, Mr. Denis B. Stratford and Natalie Friend Wilson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50471] (David S. Gragg ) [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:46 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9336754-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50471] (CNF) [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:35 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Carl Nathaniel Merkle [20-50471] (MFY) [Entered: 06/11/2020 08:57 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the "Opposed motion informing the 5th Circuit Appeals Court that the Record on Appeal is incomplete etc" received from Appellant Mr. Carl Nathaniel Merkle because at your direction, we are taking no action on this motion, You will refile at a later date. [20-50471] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/17/2020 for Appellant Carl Nathaniel Merkle. [20-50471] (DDL) [Entered: 07/07/2020 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50471] (DDL) [Entered: 07/07/2020 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9349293-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50471] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/07/2020 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9344086-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Carl Nathaniel Merkle. [9344086-1] [20-50471] (RSM) [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Natalie Friend Wilson for Appellee Capital Crossing Servicing Company, L.L.C. in 20-50471, Attorney Natalie Friend Wilson for Appellee William C. Garlington in 20-50471, Attorney Natalie Friend Wilson for Appellee Denis B. Stratford in 20-50471, Attorney Natalie Friend Wilson for Appellee Kevin F. Shea in 20-50471, Attorney Natalie Friend Wilson for Appellee Langley & Banack, Incorporated in 20-50471, Attorney Natalie Friend Wilson for Appellee Natalie Friend Wilson in 20-50471, Attorney Natalie Friend Wilson for Appellee David S. Gragg in 20-50471 [20-50471] (RAJ) [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Bradley M. Gordon for Appellee Reese Gordon Marketos, L.L.P. in 20-50471, Attorney Bradley M. Gordon for Appellee Joel W. Reese in 20-50471, Attorney Bradley M. Gordon for Appellee Bradley M. Gordon in 20-50471 [20-50471] (RAJ) [Entered: 06/26/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joel Wilson Reese for Appellee Reese Gordon Marketos, L.L.P. in 20-50471, Attorney Joel Wilson Reese for Appellee Joel W. Reese in 20-50471, Attorney Joel Wilson Reese for Appellee Bradley M. Gordon in 20-50471 [20-50471] (RAJ) [Entered: 06/26/2020 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Natalie Friend Wilson, Esq. for Capital Crossing Servicing Company, L.L.C., Mr. William C. Garlington, David S. Gragg, Langley & Banack, Incorporated, Mr. Kevin F. Shea, Mr. Denis B. Stratford and Natalie Friend Wilson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50471] (Natalie Friend Wilson ) [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50471] (Bradley M. Gordon ) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50471] (Joel Wilson Reese ) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David S. Gragg for Appellee Capital Crossing Servicing Company, L.L.C. in 20-50471, Attorney David S. Gragg for Appellee William C. Garlington in 20-50471, Attorney David S. Gragg for Appellee Denis B. Stratford in 20-50471, Attorney David S. Gragg for Appellee Kevin F. Shea in 20-50471, Attorney David S. Gragg for Appellee Langley & Banack, Incorporated in 20-50471, Attorney David S. Gragg for Appellee Natalie Friend Wilson in 20-50471, Attorney David S. Gragg for Appellee David S. Gragg in 20-50471 [20-50471] (RAJ) [Entered: 06/24/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David S. Gragg for Capital Crossing Servicing Company, L.L.C., Mr. William C. Garlington, David S. Gragg, Langley & Banack, Incorporated, Mr. Kevin F. Shea, Mr. Denis B. Stratford and Natalie Friend Wilson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50471] (David S. Gragg ) [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:19-CV-640. Electronic ROA due on 07/06/2020. [20-50471] (CNF) [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9336754-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50471] (CNF) [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Carl Nathaniel Merkle [20-50471] (MFY) [Entered: 06/11/2020 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL CROSSING SERVICING COMPANY, L.L.C. is a litigant