This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:01 (UTC).

Carl Gordon v. Gregory Holloway

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Carl Gordon filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Gregory Holloway. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7032

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GEORGE HINKLE, Regional Administrator for the Western Region of Virginia Department of Corrections

GREGORY HOLLOWAY, Former Warden of Wallens Ridge State Prison

B. J. RAVIZEE, Institutional Ombudsman at Wallens Ridge State Prison

JOHN COMBS, Assistant Warden of Wallens Ridge State Prison

DENNIS COLLINS, Unit Manager of D-Building at Wallens Ridge State Prison

DAVID ZOOK, Former Assistant Warden of Wallens Ridge State Prison

ROBERT BIVENS, Regional Ombudsman for the Western Region of the Virginia Department of Corrections

Plaintiff / Appellant

CARL D. GORDON

Big Stone Gap, VA 24219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Richard Carson Vorhis

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Carl D. Gordon

Attorney at WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON

P. O. Box 759

Big Stone Gap, VA 24219

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Carl D. Gordon re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:59 PM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:54 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed [1000583991] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:50 PM]

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Carl D. Gordon ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:52 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00058-NKM-JCH. Case manager: KStump. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:46 PM]

#4

(#4) RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. Due: 07/31/2019. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:17 AM]

#8

(#8) Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00058-NKM-JCH. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:51 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00058-NKM-JCH. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed [1000583991] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Carl D. Gordon re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • (#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00058-NKM-JCH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. Due: 07/31/2019. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Carl D. Gordon ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Carl D. Gordon. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:15-cv-00058-NKM-JCH. Case manager: KStump. [19-7032] KS [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.