This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/07/2022 at 05:29:30 (UTC).

Carjuan Adkins v. Richard Watson, et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Carjuan Adkins filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Richard Watson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1726

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CARJUAN D. ADKINS

Belleville, IL 62220-0000

Defendant / Appellees

RICHARD WATSON, Sheriff, St. Clair County Sheriff's Department

TRINITY SERVICE GROUP, Trinity Commissary, St. Clair County Sheriff's Department

DAVID MARCOWITZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Carjuan D. Adkins

Attorney at ST. CLAIR COUNTY JAIL

700 N. Fifth Street

Belleville, IL 62220-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas J. Hunter

Attorney at BECKER, HOERNER & YSURSA, P.C.

5111 W. Main Street

Belleville, IL 62226-4728

Alexander Chosid

Attorney at TKC HOLDINGS, INC.

1260 Andes Boulevard

St. Louis, MO 63132

Rodney M. Sharp

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX & VON GONTARD P.C.

600 Washington Avenue

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

Kevin Peek

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX & VON GONTARD P.C.

600 Washington Avenue

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Rights Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kevin K. Peek for Appellee David Marcowitz. [2] [7234057] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1726] [2] [7234057] [22-1726]--[Edited 05/04/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Peek, Kevin) [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:19 PM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Alexander B. Chosid for Appellee Trinity Service Group. [3] [7234072] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1726] (Chosid, Alexander) [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:46 PM]

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas J. Hunter for Appellee Richard Watson. [4] [7234264] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1726] (Hunter, Thomas) [Entered: 05/05/2022 01:28 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas J. Hunter for Appellee Richard Watson. [4] [7234264] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1726] (Hunter, Thomas) [Entered: 05/05/2022 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Alexander B. Chosid for Appellee Trinity Service Group. [3] [7234072] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1726] (Chosid, Alexander) [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kevin K. Peek for Appellee David Marcowitz. [2] [7234057] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1726] [2] [7234057] [22-1726]--[Edited 05/04/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Peek, Kevin) [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Carjuan D. Adkins by 05/05/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 05/12/2022. [1] [7232830] [22-1726] (CG) [Entered: 04/29/2022 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Brewster Chosid

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J Hunter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodney M. Sharp