This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2019 at 06:07:42 (UTC).

Caree Harper v. Otis Wright, II, et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 Caree Harper filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Otis Wright, II. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55915

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

OTIS D. WRIGHT II, U.S. District Court Judge, individual and official capacities

DOES, 1-10

DAVID L. HARLOW, U.S.M.S., individual and official capacities

AKAL SECURITY

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

U.S.M.S. DEPUTIES

AKAL SECURITY GUARDS

STACIA A. HYLTON, U.S.M.S. Director, individual and official capacities

Plaintiff / Appellant

CAREE ANNETTE HARPER

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Oren Blau

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Sarah Weiner

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

H. Thomas Byron III

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Caree Annette Harper

4640 Admiralty Way

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • (#9) Added Attorney(s) H. Thomas Byron III for party(s) Appellee USA Appellee David L. Harlow Appellee Otis D. Wright II Appellee Stacia A. Hylton, in case 19-55915. [11454392] (CW) [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of H. Thomas Byron III (Civil Division, Appellate Staff, US Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellees David L. Harlow, Stacia A. Hylton, USA and Otis D. Wright, II. Date of service: 10/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11454332] [19-55915] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#7) Streamlined request [6] by Appellant Caree Annette Harper to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Caree Annette Harper opening brief due 11/04/2019. Appellees Akal Security, Akal Security Guards, Does, David L. Harlow, Stacia A. Hylton, U.S.M.S. Deputies, United States of America and Otis D. Wright II answering brief due 12/04/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11454132] (DLM) [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Caree Annette Harper. New requested due date is 11/04/2019. [11453781] [19-55915] (Harper, Caree) [Entered: 10/03/2019 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#5) Attorney Jessica O. Cheh substituted by Attorney Sarah Weiner in 19-55915 [11450183] (CW) [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah E Weiner (United States Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellees David L. Harlow, Stacia A. Hylton, USA and Otis D. Wright, II. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Jessica O. Cheh for Appellees David L. Harlow, Stacia A. Hylton, USA and Otis D. Wright, II. Date of service: 10/01/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11449962] [19-55915] (Weiner, Sarah) [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#3) Attorney Daniel Oren Blau, substituted by Attorney Jessica O. Cheh, in 19-55915 [11434199] (CW) [Entered: 09/17/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jessica O. Cheh (United States Attorney's Office, Federal Building, 300 N. Los Angeles Street, Rm. 7516, Los Angeles, CA 90012) for Appellees Otis D. Wright, II, Stacia A. Hylton, David L. Harlow and USA. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Daniel Oren Blau for Appellees David L. Harlow, Stacia A. Hylton, USA and Otis D. Wright, II. Date of service: 09/17/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11434175] [19-55915] (Cheh, Jessica) [Entered: 09/17/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Caree Annette Harper opening brief due 10/04/2019. Appellees Akal Security, Akal Security Guards, Does, David L. Harlow, Stacia A. Hylton, U.S.M.S. Deputies, United States of America and Otis D. Wright II answering brief due 11/04/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11388288] (JBS) [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AKAL SECURITY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caree Annette Harper Esquire