This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:49 (UTC).

Carbajal v. Williams, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Carbajal filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1249

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

DEAN WILLIAMS, Executive Director of CDOC

THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF COLORADO

Petitioner / Appellant

DEAN CARBAJAL

Sterling, CO 80751

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Matthew S. Holman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Dean Carbajal

Attorney at SCF - Sterling Correctional Facility

P.O. Box 6000

Sterling, CO 80751

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10676362] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant's motion for access to court record for purpose of appeal filed by Appellant Dean Carbajal. Appellant's brief remains due 9/25/2019. See attached order for further details. Served on 09/05/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:07 PM]

Open Document

[10675388] Notice of change of address filed by Dean Carbajal in 17-1301, 18-1132, and 19-1249. [17-1301, 18-1132, 19-1249] [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:43 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document

[10673721] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on Appellant's "Response to State's Motion to Clarify Regarding Petitioner's Opening Brief," requesting that the court strike his brief submitted on 08/12/2019 and "return [the brief] to the court of proper jurisdiction with the entire envelope (DOC time stamp)." Upon consideration, the response is construed as a motion to withdraw the 08/12/2019 brief and, so construed, the motion is granted as modified. The Clerk shall remove the 08/12/2019 brief from the docket for the instant appeal and shall return the brief, including the envelope in which the brief was mailed, to appellant. Appellant's opening brief remains due 09/25/2019. Served on 08/27/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:10 AM]

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Response

Open Document

[10672881] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on appellant's motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief until 09/28/2019. Appellees filed a motion to clarify regarding petitioner - Appellant's Opening Brief, requesting that the court clarify whether the 08/12/2019 opening brief was filed in error. Appellant's motion for extension of time is construed as a response to the motion to clarify and no further response from the appellant regarding the motion to clarify is granted. The motion to clarify is granted. Appellant's motion for extension of time is granted as modified. Appellant's opening brief in the instant appeal is now due 09/25/2019. Served on 08/22/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:05 PM]

Open Document

[10672763] Appellant's motion filed by Dean Carbajal to extend time to file appellant's brief. Served on 08/17/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:35 AM]

Open Document

[10670324] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - appellant's response to motion to clarify regarding petitioner-appellant's brief due 08/23/2019 for Dean Carbajal. Served on 08/13/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:18 PM]

Open Document

[10670278] Motion filed by Appellees The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Dean Williams Seeking clarification concerning Opening Brief filed in this Court in error.. Served on: 08/13/2019. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 08/13/2019 by SDS to modify text] [19-1249] MSH [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:58 AM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Envelope

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10663804] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Matthew S. Holman for The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Dean Williams. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1249] [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:28 PM]

Open Document #1

Volume I Pleadings

Open Document #2

Volume 2 Pleadings

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10676362] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant's motion for access to court record for purpose of appeal filed by Appellant Dean Carbajal. Appellant's brief remains due 9/25/2019. See attached order for further details. Served on 09/05/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10675388] Notice of change of address filed by Dean Carbajal in 17-1301, 18-1132, and 19-1249. [17-1301, 18-1132, 19-1249] [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10674184] Appellant's motion filed by Dean Carbajal to purchase record. Served on 08/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10673721] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on Appellant's "Response to State's Motion to Clarify Regarding Petitioner's Opening Brief," requesting that the court strike his brief submitted on 08/12/2019 and "return [the brief] to the court of proper jurisdiction with the entire envelope (DOC time stamp)." Upon consideration, the response is construed as a motion to withdraw the 08/12/2019 brief and, so construed, the motion is granted as modified. The Clerk shall remove the 08/12/2019 brief from the docket for the instant appeal and shall return the brief, including the envelope in which the brief was mailed, to appellant. Appellant's opening brief remains due 09/25/2019. Served on 08/27/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10673561] Response filed by Dean Carbajal to appellees' motion to clarify construed as a motion to withdraw the 08/12/2019 appellant's brief [ # 10670324-2 ]. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10672881] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on appellant's motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief until 09/28/2019. Appellees filed a motion to clarify regarding petitioner - Appellant's Opening Brief, requesting that the court clarify whether the 08/12/2019 opening brief was filed in error. Appellant's motion for extension of time is construed as a response to the motion to clarify and no further response from the appellant regarding the motion to clarify is granted. The motion to clarify is granted. Appellant's motion for extension of time is granted as modified. Appellant's opening brief in the instant appeal is now due 09/25/2019. Served on 08/22/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10672763] Appellant's motion filed by Dean Carbajal to extend time to file appellant's brief. Served on 08/17/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670324] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - appellant's response to motion to clarify regarding petitioner-appellant's brief due 08/23/2019 for Dean Carbajal. Served on 08/13/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670278] Motion filed by Appellees The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Dean Williams Seeking clarification concerning Opening Brief filed in this Court in error.. Served on: 08/13/2019. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 08/13/2019 by SDS to modify text] [19-1249] MSH [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket pursuant to the court's 08/27/2019 order. [AT] [10670079] Appellant brief received from Dean Carbajal, but not filed. [19-1249]--[Edited 08/22/2019 by AT - This brief was intended for a state court case. Please see the court's the 8/22/19 order.] [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668275] Appellant's motion filed by Dean Carbajal for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 08/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668272] Entry of appearance filed by Dean Carbajal. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1249] [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663804] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Matthew S. Holman for The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Dean Williams. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1249] [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • [10663801] Entry of appearance submitted by Matthew S. Holman for Appellees The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Dean Williams for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1249]--[Edited 07/17/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 7/17/2019] MSH [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663646] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings, Volume 2 pleadings. [19-1249] [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663559] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief, notice of appearance, and fee or ifp forms due by 08/26/2019 for Dean Carbajal. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 08/06/2019. [19-1249] [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663558] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [19-1249] [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663328] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/15/2019. Fee or ifp forms due 08/15/2019 for Dean Carbajal. Notice of appearance due on 08/15/2019 for Dean Carbajal, and Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2019 for The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Dean Williams. [19-1249] [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.