This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 06:10:10 (UTC).

Caquelin v. US

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Caquelin filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1385

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

NORMA E. CAQUELIN

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas Scott Stewart

Attorney at Stewart Wald & McCulley, LLC

2100 Central

Kansas City, MO 64108

Elizabeth McCulley

Attorney at Stewart Wald & McCulley, LLC

2100 Central

Kansas City, MO 64108

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Erika Kranz

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 7415

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION of Appellant US to extend the time to 05/10/2019 to file the United States' opening brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/28/2019 by email. [589321] [19-1385] [Erika Kranz] [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:22 AM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 02/07/2019 by email. [584082] [19-1385] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:57 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant US. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583887] [19-1385] [Erika Kranz] [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:32 PM]

#7

(#7) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 01/22/2019 by email. [579663] [19-1385] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:48 AM]

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Norma E. Caquelin, Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 01/29/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[579630] [MMA] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:09 AM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Elizabeth A. McCulley as of counsel for Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579370] [19-1385] [Elizabeth McCulley] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:24 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579369] [19-1385]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 6 ] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:22 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Thomas S. Stewart as principal counsel for Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579367] [19-1385] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:21 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Erika B. Kranz as principal counsel for Appellant US. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579228] [19-1385] [Erika Kranz] [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:47 AM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to extend time to file brief Docket No. [ # 10 ], ERROR: Appellant's motion [ # 10 ] did not contain a certificate of compliance with the word count. CORRECTION: For future motions, pursuant to FRAP 32(g)(1), please include a certificate of compliance with the word count. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [589592] [JAL] [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Appellant US. Appellant's opening brief is due 05/10/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [589590] [JAL] [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION of Appellant US to extend the time to 05/10/2019 to file the United States' opening brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 02/28/2019 by email. [589321] [19-1385] [Erika Kranz] [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 02/07/2019 by email. [584082] [19-1385] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant US. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583887] [19-1385] [Erika Kranz] [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 01/22/2019 by email. [579663] [19-1385] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Norma E. Caquelin, Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 01/29/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[579630] [MMA] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Elizabeth A. McCulley as of counsel for Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579370] [19-1385] [Elizabeth McCulley] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579369] [19-1385]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 6 ] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Thomas S. Stewart as principal counsel for Appellee Norma E. Caquelin. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579367] [19-1385] [Thomas Stewart] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Erika B. Kranz as principal counsel for Appellant US. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579228] [19-1385] [Erika Kranz] [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/02/2019. [576792] Entry of Appearance due 01/23/2019. Certificate of Interest due 01/23/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/08/2019. Appellant's brief due 03/11/2019. [MJL] [Entered: 01/09/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.