This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/04/2022 at 06:03:55 (UTC).

Capitol Records, LLC v. Vimeo, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Capitol Records, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Vimeo, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2949

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Defendant

Does, 1-20 inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellants

Capitol Records, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company

Caroline Records, Inc., a New York Corporation

Virgin Records America, Inc., a California Corporation

EMI Blackwood Music Inc., a Connecticut Corporation

EMI April Music Inc., a Connecticut Corporation

EMI Virgin Music, Inc., a New York Corporation

Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., a New York Corporation

EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., a New York Corporation

EMI Unart Catalog Inc., a New York Corporation

Stone Diamond Music Corporation, a Michigan Corporation

EMI U Catalog Inc., a New York Corporation

Jobete Music Co., Inc., a Michigan Corporation

Defendant / Appellees

Vimeo, Inc., a Delaware Limited Liability company, AKA Vimeo.com

Connected Ventures, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky Esq.

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Russell J. Frackman Esq.

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East, 18Th Flor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Catherine Emily Stetson

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Todd Anten Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Robert Lloyd Raskopf Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Michael Andrew Cheah Esq.

Attorney at IAC/InterActiveCorp

555 West 18Th Street

New York, NY 10011

Kathleen M. Sullivan

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 03/09/2022, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[3275032] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:51 PM]

#66

(#66) LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, without prejudice to reinstatement by 04/08/2022, FILED.[3275021] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:41 PM]

#65

(#65) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[3275016] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:36 PM]

#58

(#58) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Stipulation, [ # 3273012-2 ], on behalf Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation, Virgin Records America, Inc. and Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2949, Does, Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2974, FILED.[3273846] [21-2949, 21-2974]--[Edited 03/08/2022 by BM] [Entered: 03/08/2022 01:30 PM]

#57

(#57) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Follow-up Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/07/2022, Start Time: 2:30 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3273435] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/08/2022 08:56 AM]

#56

(#56) LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 03/07/2022 by CM/ECF.[3273016] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/07/2022 02:16 PM]

#55

(#55) NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, RECEIVED. Service date 03/07/2022 by CM/ECF.[3273008] [21-2949]--[Edited 03/08/2022 by BM] [Entered: 03/07/2022 02:12 PM]

#52

(#52) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Vimeo, Inc. and Connected Ventures, LLC in 21-2949, 21-2974, FILED. Service date 02/17/2022 by CM/ECF. [3263729] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 02/17/2022 05:05 PM]

#49

No Description Available

#46

No Description Available

#40

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 03/09/2022, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[3275032] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, without prejudice to reinstatement by 04/08/2022, FILED.[3275021] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[3275016] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: Stipulation [ # 3273012-2 ], [ # 58 ], on behalf of Does, Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation, Virgin Records America, Inc. and Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2949, Does, Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2974, FILED.[3273855] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/08/2022 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Stipulation, [ # 3273012-2 ], on behalf Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation, Virgin Records America, Inc. and Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2949, Does, Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2974, FILED.[3273846] [21-2949, 21-2974]--[Edited 03/08/2022 by BM] [Entered: 03/08/2022 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Follow-up Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/07/2022, Start Time: 2:30 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3273435] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/08/2022 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 03/07/2022 by CM/ECF.[3273016] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 03/07/2022 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, RECEIVED. Service date 03/07/2022 by CM/ECF.[3273008] [21-2949]--[Edited 03/08/2022 by BM] [Entered: 03/07/2022 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ATTORNEY, Michael Andrew Cheah for Vimeo, Inc. Connected Ventures, LLC, in case 21-2974 Michael Andrew Cheah for Vimeo, Inc. Connected Ventures, LLC, in case 21-2949 , [ # 52 ], ADDED.[3267217] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 02/24/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Vimeo, Inc. and Connected Ventures, LLC in 21-2949, 21-2974, FILED. Service date 02/17/2022 by CM/ECF. [3263729] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 02/17/2022 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Vimeo, Inc. and Connected Ventures, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3226607] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/10/2021 06:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Vimeo, Inc. and Connected Ventures, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/10/2021 by CM/ECF.[3226586] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/10/2021 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY, Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky for Appellants Virgin Records America, Inc., Caroline Records, Inc. and Capitol Records, LLC, in case 21-2949 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3225981] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/09/2021 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Catherine Emily Stetson for Appellants Virgin Records America, Inc., Caroline Records, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, in case 21-2949 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3225980] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/09/2021 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc. and Virgin Records America, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3225136] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/08/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc. and Virgin Records America, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3225129] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/08/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3220301] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/01/2021 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 11/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3220290] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/01/2021 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc. and Virgin Records America, Inc., district court receipt # NYSDC-25394378, FILED.[3220285] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/01/2021 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc. and Virgin Records America, Inc., FILED. [3220281] [21-2949] [Entered: 12/01/2021 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., a New York Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI U Catalog Inc., a New York Corporation is a litigant