This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 06:18:11 (UTC).

Capitalkeys, LLC v. Democratic Republic of Congo, et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Capitalkeys, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Democratic Republic of Congo. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-7070

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Capitalkeys, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

Democratic Republic of Congo

Central Bank of the Democratic Republic of the Congo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Robert J. Hantman

Attorney at Hantman & Associates

1120 Avenue Of The Americas, 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Hannah Wigger

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Paul Anthony Werner III

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Charles H. Spencer-Davis

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1911514] submitted by Capitalkeys, LLC [Service Date: 08/25/2021 ] [21-7070] (Hantman, Robert) [Entered: 08/25/2021 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1911513] filed by Capitalkeys, LLC [Service Date: 08/25/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [21-7070] (Hantman, Robert) [Entered: 08/25/2021 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1911510] filed by Robert J. Hantman on behalf of Appellant Capitalkeys, LLC. [21-7070] (Hantman, Robert) [Entered: 08/25/2021 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1911507] filed by Capitalkeys, LLC [Service Date: 08/25/2021 ] [21-7070] (Hantman, Robert) [Entered: 08/25/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1911506] filed by Capitalkeys, LLC [Service Date: 08/25/2021 ] [21-7070] (Hantman, Robert) [Entered: 08/25/2021 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1911505] filed by Capitalkeys, LLC [Service Date: 08/25/2021 ] [21-7070] (Hantman, Robert) [Entered: 08/25/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1911174] for leave to file initial submissions out of time filed by Capitalkeys, LLC (Service Date: 08/23/2021 by Email) Length Certification: 872 words. [21-7070]--[RELIEF REPLACED--Edited 08/25/2021 by LMC] (Hantman, Robert) [Entered: 08/23/2021 06:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1908085] filed by Central Bank of the Democratic Republic of the Congo [Service Date: 07/28/2021 ] [21-7070] (Werner, Paul) [Entered: 07/28/2021 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1908083] filed by Paul A. Werner and co-counsel Hannah J. Wigger & Charles H. Spencer-Davis on behalf of Appellee Central Bank of the Democratic Republic of the Congo. [21-7070] (Werner, Paul) [Entered: 07/28/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1904581] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/30/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/30/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/30/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/30/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/30/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/30/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/30/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/30/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/16/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/30/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/30/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/30/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/16/2021 [21-7070] [Entered: 06/30/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER [1904578] sent regarding attorney membership to Robert J. Hantman for Capitalkeys, LLC. Application for Admission due 07/30/2021. [21-7070] [Entered: 06/30/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1904575] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-02079-KBJ filed by Capitalkeys, LLC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7070. [21-7070] [Entered: 06/30/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-7070] [Entered: 06/30/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Democratic Republic of the Congo is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Anthony Werner III