This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 06:08:35 (UTC).

Cantu v. Guerra & Moore

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Cantu filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Guerra Moore. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-40493

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Mark A. Cantu

Mcallen, TX 78504

Defendant / Appellees

Carlos Guerra

J. Michael Moore

Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mark A. Cantu

801 W. Nolana

Mcallen, TX 78504

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ronald Glen Hole

Attorney at Hole & Alvarez, L.L.P.

612 W. Nolana

Mcallen, TX 78504-0000

David J. Lumber

Attorney at Guerra & Moore

4201 N. Mccoll Road

Mcallen, TX 78504-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/22/2021 for Appellant Mark A. Cantu. [21-40493] (DDL) [Entered: 08/13/2021 05:31 PM]

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #3

Exhibit 2

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document #1

Reply Filed to Response/Opposition

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Mark A. Cantu [9633783-1] to the Update/term response deadline [9633450-2]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 08/02/2021. [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/03/2021 11:03 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file a response filed by Appellant Mr. Mark A. Cantu until August 9, 2021. [ # 9633248-2 ] [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/03/2021 07:49 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Mark A. Cantu to extend the time to file a response to the Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [ # 9624657-2 ] filed by Appellees Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., Mr. Carlos Guerra and Mr. J. Michael Moore in 21-40493 until 08/09/2021 [9633248-2]. Date of service: 07/30/2021 [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 04:17 PM]

Open Document

ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Est. Completion Dt: 07/29/2021, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 06/29/2021, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 07/29/2021, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 04/17/2019. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/29/2021 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter [21-40493] (JMW) [Entered: 07/26/2021 01:02 PM]

Open Document #7

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #6

Exhibit 5

Open Document #5

Exhibit 4

Open Document #4

Exhibit 3

Open Document #3

Exhibit 2

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Mark A. Cantu. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 04/17/2019. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 07/20/2021 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter. [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 07/19/2021 09:11 AM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/22/2021 for Appellant Mark A. Cantu. [21-40493] (DDL) [Entered: 08/13/2021 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-40493] (DDL) [Entered: 08/13/2021 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER carrying with the case Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., Mr. Carlos Guerra and Mr. J. Michael Moore [ # 9624657-2 ] [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/11/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:18-CV-161. Electronic ROA due on 08/24/2021. [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/09/2021 08:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 07/28/2021 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/09/2021 08:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellees Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., Mr. Carlos Guerra and Mr. J. Michael Moore [9636683-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellant Mr. Mark A. Cantu [ # 9633783-2 ]. Date of Service: 08/06/2021 via US mail - Appellant Cantu; email - Attorney for Appellees: Hole, Lumber. [21-40493] (David J. Lumber ) [Entered: 08/06/2021 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Mark A. Cantu [9633783-1] to the Update/term response deadline [9633450-2]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 08/02/2021. [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/03/2021 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE DUE to Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., Mr. Carlos Guerra and Mr. J. Michael Moore in 21-40493 [ # 9624657-2 ]Response/Opposition deadline updated to 08/09/2021 [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/03/2021 07:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file a response filed by Appellant Mr. Mark A. Cantu until August 9, 2021. [ # 9633248-2 ] [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/03/2021 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Mark A. Cantu to extend the time to file a response to the Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [ # 9624657-2 ] filed by Appellees Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., Mr. Carlos Guerra and Mr. J. Michael Moore in 21-40493 until 08/09/2021 [9633248-2]. Date of service: 07/30/2021 [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Est. Completion Dt: 07/29/2021, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 06/29/2021, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 07/29/2021, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 04/17/2019. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/29/2021 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter [21-40493] (JMW) [Entered: 07/26/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketThe Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., Mr. Carlos Guerra and Mr. J. Michael Moore in 21-40493 [ # 9624657-2 ] has been made sufficient. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Rpl deadline satisfied. [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9624657-2]. Date of service: 07/22/2021 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: a certificate of compliance is required and certificate of interested parties should be placed after the title page Response/Opposition due on 08/02/2021.. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 08/02/2021 for Appellees Carlos Guerra, Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P. and J. Michael Moore [21-40493] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., Mr. Carlos Guerra and Mr. J. Michael Moore to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9624657-2]. Date of service: 07/22/2021 via US mail - Appellant Cantu; email - Attorney for Appellees: Hole, Lumber [21-40493] (David J. Lumber ) [Entered: 07/22/2021 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Mark A. Cantu. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 04/17/2019. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 07/20/2021 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter. [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 07/19/2021 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David J. Lumber for party(s) Appellee Carlos Guerra Appellee J. Michael Moore Appellee Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., in case 21-40493 [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 06/30/2021 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David J. Lumber for Guerra & Moore Limited, L.L.P., Mr. Carlos Guerra and Mr. J. Michael Moore for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40493] (David J. Lumber ) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9609006-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 07/15/2021 for Appellant Mark A. Cantu [21-40493] (SDH) [Entered: 06/30/2021 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Mark A. Cantu [21-40493] (RLL) [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald Glen Hole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J. Lumber