This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2021 at 06:30:06 (UTC).

Cantu v. Epic Midstream Holdings

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Cantu filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Epic Midstream Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-40011

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

Epic Midstream Holdings, LP

Epic Crude Holdings, LP

Epic Midstream Holdings GP

Plaintiff / Appellees

Stephanie Molina, Individually and on behalf of her minor children

Jose Cantu, Individually and on behalf of his minor children

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Kent M. Adams Esq.

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, L.L.P.

909 Fannin Street

Houston, TX 77010

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kurt B. Arnold

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin, L.L.P.

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Owen Joseph McGovern

Attorney at Beck Redden, L.L.P.

1221 Mckinney Street, 1 Houston Center

Houston, TX 77010

Russell S. Post

Attorney at Beck Redden, L.L.P.

1221 Mckinney Street, 1 Houston Center

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Dion Rupa. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dion Rupa, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 01/27/2021. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 02/26/2021 for Dion Rupa [21-40011] (CCR) [Entered: 02/19/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Epic Crude Holdings, LP, Epic Midstream Holdings GP and Epic Midstream Holdings, LP. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dion Rupa, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 12/16/2020. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 02/08/2021 for Dion Rupa. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9490997-2 ] [21-40011] (CCR) [Entered: 01/27/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Epic Crude Holdings, LP, Epic Midstream Holdings GP and Epic Midstream Holdings, LPfor the Court to process. Date of service: 01/27/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Adams; Attorney for Appellees: Arnold, McGovern, Post. [21-40011] (Kent M. Adams ) [Entered: 01/27/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Owen Joseph McGovern for party(s) Appellee Jose Cantu Appellee Stephanie Molina, in case 21-40011 [21-40011] (CCR) [Entered: 01/27/2021 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Russell S. Post for party(s) Appellee Jose Cantu Appellee Stephanie Molina, in case 21-40011 [21-40011] (CCR) [Entered: 01/27/2021 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40011] (Owen Joseph McGovern ) [Entered: 01/26/2021 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40011] (Russell S. Post ) [Entered: 01/26/2021 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kent M. Adams for Appellant Epic Crude Holdings, LP in 21-40011, Attorney Kent M. Adams for Appellant Epic Midstream Holdings GP in 21-40011, Attorney Kent M. Adams for Appellant Epic Midstream Holdings, LP in 21-40011 [21-40011] (CCR) [Entered: 01/25/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kent M. Adams, Esq. for Epic Crude Holdings, LP, Epic Midstream Holdings GP and Epic Midstream Holdings, LP for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40011] (Kent M. Adams ) [Entered: 01/22/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Leticia Garza. [21-40011] (Genay Rogan ) [Entered: 01/15/2021 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Leticia Garza. [21-40011] (Genay Rogan ) [Entered: 01/15/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Appearance Form filed by Frank A. Piccolo because the parties represented are not parties to this appeal [21-40011] (CCR) [Entered: 01/13/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Heather S. von Sternberg is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [21-40011] (BF) [Entered: 01/12/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9480306-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/27/2021 for Appellants Epic Crude Holdings, LP, Epic Midstream Holdings GP and Epic Midstream Holdings, LP [21-40011] (CCR) [Entered: 01/12/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Epic Crude Holdings, LP, Epic Midstream Holdings GP and Epic Midstream Holdings, LP [21-40011] (RLL) [Entered: 01/06/2021 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Epic Crude Holdings, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owen Joseph McGovern

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell S. Post