This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 06:05:48 (UTC).

Campaign Legal Center v. DOJ

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Campaign Legal Center filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against DOJ. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5143

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

United States Department of Justice

Plaintiff / Appellee

Campaign Legal Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Gerard Joseph Sinzdak

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Adav Noti

Attorney at Campaign Legal Center

1101 14Th Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [19-5143] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1794613] filed granting motion to dismiss case [ # 1792867-2 ] The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [19-5143] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:27 PM]

Open Document

CONSENT MOTION [1792867] to dismiss case (Response to Motion served by hand due on 06/24/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/24/2019) filed by DOJ (Service Date: 06/14/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 46 words. [19-5143] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:18 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1792852] filed by Gerard Sinzdak on behalf of Appellant DOJ. [19-5143] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:39 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1788745] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/05/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/05/2019 [19-5143] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:20 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788740] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00340-ABJ filed by DOJ. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5143. [19-5143] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:19 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [19-5143] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1794613] filed granting motion to dismiss case [ # 1792867-2 ] The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [19-5143] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSENT MOTION [1792867] to dismiss case (Response to Motion served by hand due on 06/24/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/24/2019) filed by DOJ (Service Date: 06/14/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 46 words. [19-5143] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1792852] filed by Gerard Sinzdak on behalf of Appellant DOJ. [19-5143] (Sinzdak, Gerard) [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1788745] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/05/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/20/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/05/2019 [19-5143] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788740] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00340-ABJ filed by DOJ. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5143. [19-5143] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5143] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.