Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2021 at 20:40:19 (UTC).

Cameron International v. Nitro Fluids L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Cameron International filed an Other lawsuit against Nitro Fluids L L C. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1183

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

Appellee and Cross Appellant

NITRO FLUIDS L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

John R. Keville Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn/Chicago

800 Capitol Street

Houston, TX 77002

Merritt D. Westcott

Attorney at Winston & Strawn/Chicago

800 Capitol Street

Houston, TX 77002

Richard L. Stanley

Attorney at Law Office of Richard L. Stanley

Po Box 7967

Houston, TX 77270

William Logan

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

800 Capitol Street

Houston, TX 77002-2925

Appellee and Cross Appellant Attorneys

James H. Hall

Attorney at Cabello Hall Zinda PLLC

801 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

J. David Cabello Esq.

Attorney at Cabello Hall Zinda PLLC

801 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

Stephen D. Zinda Esq.

Attorney at Cabello Hall Zinda PLLC

801 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION of Appellant Cameron International Corporation to extend the time to 03/22/2021 to file brief. Service: 02/10/2021 by email. [755256] [21-1183] [Merritt Westcott] [Entered: 02/10/2021 05:08 PM]

#10

(#10) Certified list received. Service: 12/21/2020 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [744562] [KMH] [Entered: 12/22/2020 08:59 AM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Cameron International Corporation. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737850] [21-1183] [John Keville] [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:48 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Cameron International Corporation. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737848] [21-1183] [John Keville] [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:46 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for John R. Keville; Merritt D. Westcott; William M. Logan; Richard L. Stanley as counsel for Appellant Cameron International Corporation. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737844] [21-1183] [John Keville] [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:44 PM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Nitro Fluids L.L.C.. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737672] [21-1183] [J. Cabello] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:33 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant Nitro Fluids L.L.C.. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737667] [21-1183] [J. Cabello] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:29 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for J. David Cabello; James H. Hall; Stephen D. Zinda as counsel for Cross-Appellant Nitro Fluids L.L.C.. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737663] [21-1183] [J. Cabello] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:24 PM]

#3

(#3) Official caption revised to reflect Cross-Appeal 21-1267. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [736957] [KMH] [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:17 PM]

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Appellant Cameron International Corporation. The opening brief is due 03/22/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [755728] [KMH] [Entered: 02/12/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION of Appellant Cameron International Corporation to extend the time to 03/22/2021 to file brief. Service: 02/10/2021 by email. [755256] [21-1183] [Merritt Westcott] [Entered: 02/10/2021 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certified list received. Service: 12/21/2020 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [744562] [KMH] [Entered: 12/22/2020 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Cameron International Corporation. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737850] [21-1183] [John Keville] [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Cameron International Corporation. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737848] [21-1183] [John Keville] [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for John R. Keville; Merritt D. Westcott; William M. Logan; Richard L. Stanley as counsel for Appellant Cameron International Corporation. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737844] [21-1183] [John Keville] [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Nitro Fluids L.L.C.. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737672] [21-1183] [J. Cabello] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant Nitro Fluids L.L.C.. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737667] [21-1183] [J. Cabello] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for J. David Cabello; James H. Hall; Stephen D. Zinda as counsel for Cross-Appellant Nitro Fluids L.L.C.. Service: 11/23/2020 by email. [737663] [21-1183] [J. Cabello] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Official caption revised to reflect Cross-Appeal 21-1267. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [736957] [KMH] [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1183 Lead with 21-1267 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [736956] [21-1183, 21-1267] [KMH] [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/04/2020. [734471] Entry of Appearance is due 11/23/2020. Certificate of Interest is due 11/23/2020. Docketing Statement is due 11/23/2020. Certified List is due 12/21/2020. [KMH] [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NITRO FLUIDS L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen D. Zinda Esq.