This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:04:13 (UTC).

Calvin Wedington v. Office of Inspector General, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Calvin Wedington filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Office of Inspector General. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1505

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Calvin Scott Wedington

Ayer, MA 01432

Defendant / Appellees

Office of Internal Affairs

Office of Inspector General

SOS Hansen, Acting Lieutenant GS 8 or 9

FMC Rochester, et al.

FBOP: Jailor-Superintendant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Calvin Scott Wedington

Attorney at U.S. MEDICAL CENTER FOR FEDERAL PRISONERS

P.O. Box 879

Ayer, MA 01432

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 04/12/2019 [4766257] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:08 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order re 3 strikes 10/9/18, Report and Recommendation 1/14/19, Order Adopting R&R 1/31/19, and Judgment 2/1/19 [4766234] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:34 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed: originating court order of 04/01/2019 granting IFP and denying motion to appt cnsl. [4774277] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:55 PM]

Open Document #1

Prisoner Civil Rights Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-1505: plra] [4777466] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 04/12/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-1505: In Forma Pauperis] [4774279] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed: originating court order of 04/01/2019 granting IFP and denying motion to appt cnsl. [4774277] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 04/12/2019 [4766257] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4766238] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order re 3 strikes 10/9/18, Report and Recommendation 1/14/19, Order Adopting R&R 1/31/19, and Judgment 2/1/19 [4766234] [19-1505] (MMH) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.