This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:05:04 (UTC).

Calvin Hollowell v. Ally Bank, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Calvin Hollowell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ally Bank. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1501

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Justin McGrew, Sales Manager, Superior Dodge Chrysler Jeep

Kit Coleman

Pablo Villatore, Salesman, Superior Dodge Chrysler Jeep

Plaintiff / Appellant

Calvin C. Hollowell

Little Rock, AR 72209-0000

Defendant / Appellee

Ally Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Calvin C. Hollowell

9610 Jacques Drive

Little Rock, AR 72209-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Johnathan Dwaine Horton

Attorney at WRIGHT & LINDSEY

Suite 2300, 200 W. Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Charles Turner Coleman

Attorney at WRIGHT & LINDSEY

Suite 2300, 200 W. Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 3/11/19, docket entries, Order 3/11/19. [4765668] [19-1501] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:13 PM]

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED. [4781829] [19-1501] (YML) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:23 AM]

Open Document #1

Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4765659] [19-1501] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:04 PM]

Open Document #1

Cover Letter

Open Document #2

Exhibit A - Order

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/02/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4765671] [19-1501] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:13 PM]

Open Document #2

Judgment: Judge Directed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED. [4781829] [19-1501] (YML) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED - Case dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. ; Denying [ # 4766417-2 ] motion to dismiss case as moot filed by Mr. Johnathan Dwaine Horton. BOBBY E. SHEPHERD, PASCO M. BOWMAN and L. STEVEN GRASZ Adp Apr 2019 [4774711] [19-1501] (YML) [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • UPDATED fee status - Filing fee paid in dist. ct. 3/18/2019. [Case Number 19-1501: paid - cs] [4767863] [19-1501] (TMF) [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. Johnathan Dwaine Horton for Appellee Ally Bank w/service 03/14/2019. [4766417] [19-1501] (JDH) [Entered: 03/14/2019 12:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/02/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4765671] [19-1501] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 3/11/19, docket entries, Order 3/11/19. [4765668] [19-1501] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4765659] [19-1501] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.