This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2020 at 06:10:47 (UTC).

Calvin Dibrell v. City of Knoxville, TN, et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Calvin Dibrell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Knoxville, TN. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5528

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CALVIN LYNDELL DIBRELL

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF KNOXVILLE, TN

BRIAN BALDWIN, Individually and in his official capacity

JOEY WHITEHEAD, Individually and in his official capacity

HORACE LANE, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER [UNKNOWN] KIMBER, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER [UNKNOWN] JONES, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER [UNKNOWN} PICKENS, Individually and in his official capacity

RICHARD WHITE, Individually and in his official capacity

THOMAS TURNER, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER FRED KIMBER, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER HORACE LANE, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER BRIAN BALDWIN, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER CHRISTOPHER JONES, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER THOMAS TURNER, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER RICHARD WHITE, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER JOHN PICKENS, Individually and in his official capacity

OFFICER JOEY WHITEHEAD, Individually and in his official capacity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Terrell L. Tooten

Attorney at Terrell Tooten

1160 Vickery Lane, Suite 2

Cordova, TN 38016

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ronald Eugene Mills

Attorney at City of Knoxville Law Department

400 Main Street, Suite 699, P.O. Box 1631

Knoxville, TN 37902-0000

John M. Kizer

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore

900 S. Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37901

Earl Jerome Melson

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore

900 S. Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37901

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/27/2020;. appellee brief due 08/25/2020; (BSM) [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:46 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee City of Knoxville, TN by Ronald E. Mills. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-5528] (REM) [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:04 AM]

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Earl Jerome Melson for Appellees Brian Baldwin, Christopher Jones, Fred Kimber, Horace Lane, John Pickens, Thomas Turner, Richard White and Joey Whitehead Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-5528] (EJM) [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:24 AM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Brian Baldwin, Christopher Jones, Fred Kimber, Horace Lane, John Pickens, Thomas Turner, Richard White and Joey Whitehead by E. Jerome Melson. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-5528] (EJM) [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:16 AM]

9 #2

letter sent

9 #1

Letter

#8

(#8) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/15/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/20/2020 02:21 PM]

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for Appellant Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell Certificate of Service: 05/19/2020. [20-5528] (TLT) [Entered: 05/19/2020 05:15 PM]

#5

(#5) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for Appellant Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell. Certificate of Service:05/19/2020. [20-5528] (TLT) [Entered: 05/19/2020 05:14 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell by Terrell Tooten. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2020. [20-5528] (TLT) [Entered: 05/19/2020 05:13 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell. Transcript needed: n. (BSM) [Entered: 05/19/2020 04:36 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/27/2020;. appellee brief due 08/25/2020; (BSM) [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#13) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 06/16/2020 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee City of Knoxville, TN by Ronald E. Mills. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-5528] (REM) [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Earl Jerome Melson for Appellees Brian Baldwin, Christopher Jones, Fred Kimber, Horace Lane, John Pickens, Thomas Turner, Richard White and Joey Whitehead Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-5528] (EJM) [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Brian Baldwin, Christopher Jones, Fred Kimber, Horace Lane, John Pickens, Thomas Turner, Richard White and Joey Whitehead by E. Jerome Melson. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-5528] (EJM) [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER SENT to Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell, Mr. John M. Kizer for Joey Whitehead, Thomas Turner, Richard White, John Pickens, Fred Kimber, Christopher Jones, Brian Baldwin and Horace Lane, Mr. Earl Jerome Melson for Joey Whitehead, Thomas Turner, Richard White, John Pickens, Fred Kimber, Christopher Jones, Brian Baldwin and Horace Lane and Mr. Ronald Eugene Mills for City of Knoxville, TN, regarding corrected caption. (BSM) [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/15/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/20/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docket(#7) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 05/20/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for Appellant Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell Certificate of Service: 05/19/2020. [20-5528] (TLT) [Entered: 05/19/2020 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for Appellant Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell. Certificate of Service:05/19/2020. [20-5528] (TLT) [Entered: 05/19/2020 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell by Terrell Tooten. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2020. [20-5528] (TLT) [Entered: 05/19/2020 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2020. [20-5528] (TLT) [Entered: 05/19/2020 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Briston Mitchell (BSM) [Entered: 05/19/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Calvin Lyndell Dibrell. Transcript needed: n. (BSM) [Entered: 05/19/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer E Jerome Melson