This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/09/2022 at 06:06:39 (UTC).

Calogero v. Shows, Cali & Walsh

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Calogero filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Shows, Cali Walsh. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-30487

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Iris Calogero, On her own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Margie Nell Randolph, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

Shows, Cali & Walsh, L.L.P., a Louisiana limited liability partnership

Mary Catherine Cali

John C. Walsh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer C. Deasy

1100 Poydras Street, Energy Centre

New Orleans, LA 70163

Keren E. Gesund

Attorney at Gesund & Pailet, L.L.C.

3421 N. Causeway Boulevard

Metairie, LA 70002

Margaret E. Woodward

1229 N. Tonti Street

New Orleans, LA 70119

Kirsten Anderson

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

400 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36104

Clara Potter

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

201 Saint Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jamie Bj Rush

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

150 E. Ponce De Leon Avenue

Decatur, GA 30030

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David Scranton Daly Esq.

Attorney at Frilot, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street, Energy Centre

New Orleans, LA 70163-3600

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Iris Calogero and Ms. Margie Nell Randolph [22-30487] (MCS) [Entered: 08/10/2022 04:19 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9914844-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 08/29/2022 for Appellants Iris Calogero and Margie Nell Randolph [22-30487] (MCS) [Entered: 08/12/2022 12:15 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [22-30487] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Iris Calogero and Ms. Margie Nell Randolph advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 09/06/2022, via email - Attorney for Appellee: Daly; Attorney for Appellants: Deasy, Gesund, Woodward. [22-30487] (Margaret E. Woodward ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 11:39 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/17/2022 for Appellants Iris Calogero and Margie Nell Randolph. [22-30487] (DDL) [Entered: 09/07/2022 03:59 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Jennifer C. Deasy ) [Entered: 09/09/2022 12:32 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Keren E. Gesund for Ms. Iris Calogero and Ms. Margie Nell Randolph for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Keren E. Gesund ) [Entered: 09/13/2022 11:53 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David Scranton Daly, Esq. for Ms. Mary Catherine Cali, Shows, Cali & Walsh, L.L.P. and Mr. John C. Walsh for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30487] (David Scranton Daly ) [Entered: 09/13/2022 03:57 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Jamie Bj Rush ) [Entered: 09/16/2022 01:39 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Kirsten Anderson ) [Entered: 09/16/2022 01:47 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Clara Potter ) [Entered: 09/16/2022 02:05 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Clara Potter for party(s) Appellant Iris Calogero, Appellant Margie Nell Randolph, in case 22-30487. [22-30487] (SEP) [Entered: 09/16/2022 02:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kirsten Anderson for party(s) Appellant Iris Calogero, Appellant Margie Nell Randolph, in case 22-30487. [22-30487] (SEP) [Entered: 09/16/2022 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jamie Bj Rush for party(s) Appellant Iris Calogero, Appellant Margie Nell Randolph, in case 22-30487. [22-30487] (SEP) [Entered: 09/16/2022 02:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Clara Potter ) [Entered: 09/16/2022 02:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Kirsten Anderson ) [Entered: 09/16/2022 01:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Jamie Bj Rush ) [Entered: 09/16/2022 01:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David Scranton Daly for Appellees John C. Walsh, Mary Catherine Cali, and Shows, Cali & Walsh, L.L.P. in 22-30487. [22-30487] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/13/2022 04:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David Scranton Daly, Esq. for Ms. Mary Catherine Cali, Shows, Cali & Walsh, L.L.P. and Mr. John C. Walsh for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30487] (David Scranton Daly ) [Entered: 09/13/2022 03:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Keren E. Gesund for Appellants Margie Nell Randolph and Iris Calogero in 22-30487. [22-30487] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/13/2022 12:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Keren E. Gesund for Ms. Iris Calogero and Ms. Margie Nell Randolph for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Keren E. Gesund ) [Entered: 09/13/2022 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Ms. Iris Calogero and Ms. Margie Nell Randolph. Extension Granted to and including 11/16/2022. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/16/2022, for Appellants Iris Calogero and Margie Nell Randolph. [22-30487] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/12/2022 02:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jennifer C. Deasy for Appellants Margie Nell Randolph andt Iris Calogero in 22-30487. [22-30487] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/12/2022 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30487] (Jennifer C. Deasy ) [Entered: 09/09/2022 12:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/17/2022 for Appellants Iris Calogero and Margie Nell Randolph. [22-30487] (DDL) [Entered: 09/07/2022 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30487] (DDL) [Entered: 09/07/2022 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:18-CV-6709. Electronic ROA due on 09/21/2022. [22-30487] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 12:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [22-30487] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Iris Calogero and Ms. Margie Nell Randolph advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 09/06/2022, via email - Attorney for Appellee: Daly; Attorney for Appellants: Deasy, Gesund, Woodward. [22-30487] (Margaret E. Woodward ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9914844-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 08/29/2022 for Appellants Iris Calogero and Margie Nell Randolph [22-30487] (MCS) [Entered: 08/12/2022 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Iris Calogero and Ms. Margie Nell Randolph [22-30487] (MCS) [Entered: 08/10/2022 04:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Appellant Margie Nell Randolph added to case. Reason: It was inadvertently not added at case opening. [22-30487] (MCS) [Entered: 08/10/2022 04:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David S Daly