Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 06:25:06 (UTC).

Callen Properties v. Callen, et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Callen Properties filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Callen. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6117

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

CALLEN PROPERTIES LLC, an Oklahoma limited liability company

Defendant / Appellees

JOSEPH SETH CALLEN, an individual

DEVILS CLAW RANCH LLC, an Oklahoma limited liability company

Not Yet Classified

FARM CREDIT OF WESTERN OKLAHOMA FLCA, a wholly owned subsidiary of Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma, ACA

CLINTON RAY BIRCHELL, an individual

NICK CALLEN, an individual

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, acting through the Farm Services Agency, a Division of the United States Department of Agriculture

MARK WESNER

WESNER WESNER AND RAINBOLT PLLC, an Oklahoma professional limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jon T. Lee

Attorney at Lee Dobson Lee

1300 East 9Th, Suite 1

Edmond, OK 73034

Larry Matthew Dobson

Attorney at Lee Dobson Lee

1300 East 9Th, Suite 1

Edmond, OK 73034

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Patrick T. Cornell

P.O. Box 847

Clinton, OK 73601

Erin Joseph Rooney

Attorney at Gungoll, Jackson, Box & Devoll

101 Park Avenue, Suite 1400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Bradley A. Gungoll

Attorney at Gungoll, Jackson, Box & Devoll

101 Park Avenue, Suite 1400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Kay Sewell

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

210 West Park Avenue, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

J. Chris Horton

Attorney at J. Chris Horton, P.C.

212 North Rock Island Avenue, P.O. Box 576

El Reno, OK 73036

Barry P. Squires

Attorney at Buzbee Upchurch Squires & Eastwood

203 West Broadway

Anadarko, OK 73005

Kyle N. Eastwood

Attorney at Buzbee Upchurch Squires & Eastwood

203 West Broadway

Anadarko, OK 73005

Sara G. Bondurant

Attorney at Graft & Walraven

4801 Gaillardia Parkway, Suite 150

Oklahoma City, OK 73142

Justin Don Meek

Attorney at Nelson Terry Morton DeWitt & Paruolo

P.O. Box 138800

Oklahoma City, OK 73113

Ryan L. Dean

Attorney at Nelson Terry Morton DeWitt & Paruolo

P.O. Box 138800

Oklahoma City, OK 73113

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10774694] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 11/03/2020 for Callen Properties LLC. [20-6117] [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:36 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10767504] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance or notice of non-participation past due for Nick Callen. Notice of appearance now due on 09/08/2020 for Nick Callen [20-6117] [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:08 PM]

Open Document

[10766208] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance past due from Nick Callen. Notice of appearance due on 08/31/2020 for Nick Callen [20-6117] [Entered: 08/28/2020 08:32 AM]

Open Document

[10765834] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 09/25/2020 for Kyle N. Eastwood. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:17 PM]

Open Document

[10765531] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/26/2020. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due on 10/05/2020 for Callen Properties LLC [20-6117] [Entered: 08/26/2020 09:09 AM]

Open Document

[10765436] Docketing statement filed by Callen Properties LLC. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] JTL [Entered: 08/25/2020 05:31 PM]

Open Document

[10765429] Entry of appearance filed by Larry Matthew Dobson and Jon T Lee for Callen Properties LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-6117] [Entered: 08/25/2020 04:36 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10765164] Entry of appearance filed by Ryan L. Dean and Mr. Justin Don Meek for Wesner Wesner and Rainbolt PLLC and Mark Wesner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/24/2020 05:55 PM]

Open Document

[10764969] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Bradley A. Gungoll for and Mr. Erin Joseph Rooney for Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma FLCA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:56 AM]

Open Document

[10764299] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kay Sewell for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:08 AM]

Open Document

[10762263] Amended notice of appeal filed. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:43 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10774694] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 11/03/2020 for Callen Properties LLC. [20-6117] [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10774682] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-6117] [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket[10770929] Attorney Mr. Kyle N. Eastwood for Clinton Ray Birchell admitted to the bar of this court. [20-6117] [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10767504] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance or notice of non-participation past due for Nick Callen. Notice of appearance now due on 09/08/2020 for Nick Callen [20-6117] [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766208] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance past due from Nick Callen. Notice of appearance due on 08/31/2020 for Nick Callen [20-6117] [Entered: 08/28/2020 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765834] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 09/25/2020 for Kyle N. Eastwood. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765531] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/26/2020. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due on 10/05/2020 for Callen Properties LLC [20-6117] [Entered: 08/26/2020 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket[10765472] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/02/2020 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-6117] [Entered: 08/26/2020 07:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765436] Docketing statement filed by Callen Properties LLC. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] JTL [Entered: 08/25/2020 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765429] Entry of appearance filed by Larry Matthew Dobson and Jon T Lee for Callen Properties LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-6117] [Entered: 08/25/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765194] Entry of appearance filed by J. Chris Horton for Clinton Ray Birchell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/25/2020 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket[10765170] Entry of appearance submitted by Jonathan Chris Horton for Appellee Clinton Ray Birchell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] --[Edited 08/25/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JCH [Entered: 08/24/2020 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765164] Entry of appearance filed by Ryan L. Dean and Mr. Justin Don Meek for Wesner Wesner and Rainbolt PLLC and Mark Wesner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/24/2020 05:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket[10765082] Entry of appearance submitted by Ryan L. Dean and Justin D. Meek for Appellees Wesner Wesner and Rainbolt PLLC and Mark Wesner for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117]--[Edited 08/24/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 8/24/20.] RLD [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10764969] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Bradley A. Gungoll for and Mr. Erin Joseph Rooney for Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma FLCA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket[10764931] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley A. Gungoll and Erin J. Rooney for Appellee Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma FLCA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117]--[Edited 08/24/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 8/24/20.] EJR [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10764299] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kay Sewell for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket[10764286] Entry of appearance submitted by Kay Sewell for Appellee United States of AmericaActing through the Farm Service Agency, a division of the United States Department of Agriculture for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6117]--[Edited 08/20/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] KS [Entered: 08/20/2020 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10762263] Amended notice of appeal filed. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10762140] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/11/2020 Docketing statement due 08/25/2020 for Callen Properties LLC. Transcript order form due 08/25/2020 for Callen Properties LLC. Notice of appearance due on 08/25/2020 for Clinton Ray Birchell, Nick Callen, Callen Properties LLC, Farm Credit of Western Oklahoma FLCA, United States of America, Mark Wesner and Wesner Wesner and Rainbolt PLLC. [20-6117] [Entered: 08/11/2020 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer L Matthew Dobson(Designation Retained)